Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2404406

EP2404406 - GENERIC MULTISERVICE NETWORK CENTRE FOR CREATING AND ORCHESTRATING NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 22.08.2018 [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opencode Systems O.O.D.
J.K.Hippodruma Bl.1, Ap.4
1612 Sofia / BG
[2012/02]
Inventor(s)01 / STAYKOFF, Constantin
49 rue d'Amsterdam
F-75008 Paris / FR
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/02]
Application number, filing date10707073.208.02.2010
[2018/34]
WO2010FR00087
Priority number, dateFR2009000099305.03.2009         Original published format: FR 0900993
[2012/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010100343
Date:10.09.2010
Language:FR
[2010/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2404406
Date:11.01.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2012/02]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2404406
Date:22.08.2018
Language:FR
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04W4/00, H04W84/04
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GENERISCHE MEHRFACHDIENSTNETZZENTRALE ZUM ERZEUGEN UND ORCHESTRIEREN VON NETZWERKANWENDUNGEN UND DIENSTEN[2012/02]
English:GENERIC MULTISERVICE NETWORK CENTRE FOR CREATING AND ORCHESTRATING NETWORK APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES[2012/02]
French:CENTRE RÉSEAU MULTISERVICES GÉNÉRIQUE, DE CRÉATION ET D'ORCHESTRATION D'APPLICATIONS ET DE SERVICES DE RÉSEAUX[2018/16]
Former [2012/02]CENTRE, RESEAU MULTISERVICES GENERIQUE, DE, CREATION E,T D'ORCHESTRATION D'APPLICATIONS ET DE SERVICES RESEAUX
Entry into regional phase31.08.2011National basic fee paid 
31.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
15.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2018Fee for grant paid
23.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201203   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1345456  (OPENWAVE SYS INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *
 [X]  - KAVADIAS D. ET AL, "MobileIN: Harmonized services over heterogeneous Mobile, IN and WLAN infrastructures", 14TH IST MOBILE&WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SUMMIT, Dresden, Germany, (20050619), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.eurasip.org/Proceedings/Ext/IST05/papers/400.pdf, (20091012), XP002549749 [X] 1-45 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph L *
 [L]  - INTERNET CITATION, (20050623), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.eurasip.org/Proceedings/Ext/IST05/papers_M.html, (20091012), XP002549751 [L] 1-45 * Document utilisé pour montrer la date de publication du document titré "MobileIN: Harmonized services over heterogeneous Mobile, IN and WLAN infrastructures". *
 [X]  - "AlbatrOSS Intermediate Architecture and Specifications", ALBATROSS IST-2001-34780, (20030715), pages 1 - 109, URL: http://www.ist-albatross.org/AlbatrOSS_IST34780_D8.pdf, (20091012), XP002549750 [X] 1-45 * pages 9,10 * * pages 13,14 * * pages 16-18 * * pages 67-70 * * pages 80-94 *
by applicantUS7418089
 US7184534
 WO2007050158