Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2404406 Dossier alert: RSS

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 503
02.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
02.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
02.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 51
02.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 12
02.10.2017 Description Search / examination 45
02.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.06.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
15.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
15.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 11
15.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
29.10.2015 Claims Search / examination 12
29.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
22.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
22.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 11
22.12.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.09.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.04.2014 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.02.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
24.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 3
04.04.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
21.09.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.09.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.08.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
15.07.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.09.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 61
10.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 56
22.06.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.06.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.06.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
12.03.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.03.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 9
12.03.2010 Description International Searching Authority 43
12.03.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 2