Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2404406


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.03.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.03.2018 Change - French title published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
14.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.01.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2016 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.09.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2014 First examination report published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
21.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.02.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2012 Change - extension states published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
08.05.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
09.12.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
09.12.2011 Request for examination filed published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
07.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2011 Amendment by applicant
06.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2010 PCT data prior to European publication