Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2404406

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure06.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase31.08.2011National basic fee paid 
31.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201203   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2012
European patent granted22.08.2018
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.01.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20110929
 
Event date:11.01.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:15.10.2014 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20140915
 
Event date:25.04.2018 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20180328
 
Event date:22.08.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:22.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:15.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1033737 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20180915
 
Event date:20.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602010052920 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT