Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2398609

EP2398609 - CASTING PROCESS OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/52]CASTING METHOD FOR ALUMINIUM ALLOYS
[2015/48]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Constellium Issoire
Rue Yves Lamourdedieu
ZI des Listes
63500 Issoire / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/35]For all designated states
Constellium Issoire
Rue Yves Lamourdedieu
ZI Les Listes
63500 Issoire / FR
Former [2012/06]For all designated states
Constellium France
40-44, rue Washington
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
Constellium France
17, place des Reflets La Defense
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BES, Guillaume
27 Allée des Charmettes
F-38430 Moirans / FR
02 / REY-FLANDRIN Robert
369 Chemin des Coches
Tolvon
F-38960 Saint Etienne-de-Crossey / FR
03 / RIBAUD, Olivier
270 Montée de la Rua
F-38140 Renage / FR
04 / VERNEDE, Stéphane
11 Rue Casimir Brenier
F-3800 Grenoble / FR
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)Constellium - Propriété Industrielle
C-TEC Constellium Technology Center
Propriété Industrielle
Parc Economique Centr'Alp
725, rue Aristide Bergès, CS10027
38341 Voreppe / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Butruille, Jean-Remi Pierre Marie
Constellium CRV
Service Propriété Industrielle
Parc Economique Centr'Alp
725, rue Aristide Bergès, BP 27
38341 Voreppe Cedex / FR
Former [2011/52]Butruille, Jean-Remi Pierre Marie
Alcan Centre de Recherche de Voreppe Propriété Industrielle / Industrial Property Parc Economique Centr'Alp 725, rue Aristide Bergès, BP 27
38341 Voreppe Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date10707100.315.02.2010
WO2010FR00122
Priority number, dateFR2009000078020.02.2009         Original published format: FR 0900780
US20090286594P15.12.2009         Original published format: US 286594 P
[2011/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010094852
Date:26.08.2010
Language:FR
[2010/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2398609
Date:28.12.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2398609
Date:31.10.2012
Language:FR
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/10, B22D11/117, B22D21/00
[2011/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
TitleGerman:GIESSVERFAHREN VON ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN[2015/48]
English:CASTING PROCESS OF ALUMINIUM ALLOYS[2015/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COULÉE POUR ALLIAGES D'ALUMINIUM[2011/52]
Former [2011/52]GIESSVERFAHREN FÜR ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN
Former [2011/52]CASTING METHOD FOR ALUMINIUM ALLOYS
Entry into regional phase04.08.2011National basic fee paid 
04.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
10.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2012Fee for grant paid
18.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.07.2013   
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/36]
Opponent(s)01  30.07.2013   
Novelis Inc.
3560 Lenox Road, Suite 2000
Atlanta, GA 30326 / US
Opponent's representative
Dey, Michael, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820
81635 München / DE
06.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0102/16
18.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0102/16
14.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2010
AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MK31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IE15.02.2013
LU15.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MK31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
TR31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IE15.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2015/24]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
SM31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IE15.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
MT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IE15.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IE15.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2014/06]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT31.10.2012
CY31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
RO31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT31.10.2012
CZ31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
EE31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
SK31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT31.10.2012
DK31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
BG31.01.2013
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT31.10.2012
FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/28]FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
PT28.02.2013
Former [2013/26]FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
SI31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/24]FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
GR01.02.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI31.10.2012
HR31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
LV31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
PL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI31.10.2012
LT31.10.2012
NL31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
IS28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
Former [2013/20]LT31.10.2012
NO31.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005000677  (KOLEK PAULA L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0402692  (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4709740  (JACOBY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4607679  (TSAI MEI-YUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4670050  (OOTSUKA RYOTATSU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4534807  (FIELD DAVID J [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - DANILKIN, V. A. ET AL, "Solubility of hydrogen from a water vapor atmosphere in molten aluminum", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1969), Database accession no. 1970:92802, URL: STN, XP002548727 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - KAWASHIMA, NAMIO ET AL, "Blistering of Al . III. Blistering caused by aqueous vapor in heating atmosphere", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1964), Database accession no. 1965:422670, URL: STN, XP002548728 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS2336512
 WO0230822
 US4582118
 EP0109170
 EP1964628
 US5415220
 US7267158
 EP0216393
    - C.N. COCHRAN; D.L. BELITSKUS; D.L. KINOSZ, METALLURGICAL TRANSCATIONS B, (1977), vol. 8B, pages 323 - 331