Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2540051

EP2540051 - METHOD FOR MANAGING ACCESS TO PROTECTED RESOURCES AND DELEGATING AUTHORITY IN A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 24.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT, SE
published on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
For all designated states
Universidad Politécnica De Madrid
Ramiro de Maeztu 7
28040 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MONJAS LLORENTE, Miguel Angel
C/ Embajadores 177 esc. F, 4° D
E-28045 Madrid / ES
02 / DEL ÁLAMO RAMIRO, José María
Rio Tajo 6 10B
E-28923 Alcorcon (Madrid) / ES
03 / YELMO GARCÍA, Juan Carlos
Hortensia 8
E-28933 Móstoles (Madrid) / ES
 [2013/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/15]
Former [2013/01]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10707865.124.02.2010
WO2010EP52319
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011103916
Date:01.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2540051
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011
[2013/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2540051
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2013/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU GESCHÜTZTEN RESSOURCEN UND BERECHTIGUNGSDELEGATION IN EINEM COMPUTERNETZWERK[2013/01]
English:METHOD FOR MANAGING ACCESS TO PROTECTED RESOURCES AND DELEGATING AUTHORITY IN A COMPUTER NETWORK[2013/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'ACCÈS À RESSOURCES PROTÉGÉES ET DE DÉLÉGATION D'AUTORITÉ DANS RÉSEAU INFORMATIQUE[2013/01]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2012National basic fee paid 
23.08.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2012Examination requested  [2013/01]
12.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2015Fee for grant paid
10.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2014
Opposition(s)11.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/42]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002046352  (LUDWIG GEORGE STONE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 *
 [X]  - VRANCKEN Z ZELTSAN ALCATEL-LUCENT B, "Using OAuth for Recursive Delegation; draft-vrancken-oauth-redelegati on-00.txt", USING OAUTH FOR RECURSIVE DELEGATION; DRAFT-VRANCKEN-OAUTH-REDELEGATI ON-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090901), XP015064118 [X] 1-15 * page 3 - page 7; figure 1 *
 [A]  - HAMMER-LAHAV E ET AL, "The OAuth Protocol: Web Delegation; draft-ietf-oauth-web-delegation-01.t", THE OAUTH PROTOCOL: WEB DELEGATION; DRAFT-IETF-OAUTH-WEB-DELEGATION-0 1.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090706), vol. oauth, no. 1, XP015063096 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *