EP2411801 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A NUMBER OF DROPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Conducta Gesellschaft für Mess- und Regeltechnik mbH & Co. KG Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bettmann, Oliver Ludwig Einsiedel Strasse 6 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 02 /
Kathe, Ulrich Geisnangstrasse 3 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2012/06] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
Bettmann, Oliver Pfarrer-Münch-Strasse 3 65439 Flörsheim / DE | ||
02 /
Kathe, Ulrich Seestrasse 21 71229 Leonberg / DE | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser(DE)Holding Patserve Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser(DE)Holding, Patserve, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10708770.2 | 15.03.2010 | WO2010EP53266 | Priority number, date | DE20091001860 | 25.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001860 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108801 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411801 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411801 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18, G01N35/10 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/1846 (EP,US);
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
G01N7/18 (EP,US);
Y10T436/115831 (EP,US);
Y10T436/179228 (EP,US);
Y10T436/204998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER ANZAHL VON TROPFEN | [2012/05] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A NUMBER OF DROPS | [2012/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UN NOMBRE DE GOUTTES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 28.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | HR | 07.11.2012 | IT | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MK | 07.11.2012 | MT | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | SM | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | NO | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | IS | 07.03.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | IE | 15.03.2013 | LU | 15.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MK | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
SM | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
SM | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 15.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 07.11.2012 | |
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 07.11.2012 | |
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 07.11.2012 | |
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 07.11.2012 | |
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
HR | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
NO | 07.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006058051 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0028]; figure . *; | [A]DE19617910 (SIEPMANN FRIEDRICH W [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE4344441 (SIEPMANN FRIEDRICH W [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE10127353 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0237773 |