blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2411350 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2411350



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 465
20.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.12.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.12.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.12.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
19.11.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.08.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
09.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
05.06.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.05.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.05.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.04.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
03.04.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.04.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
03.04.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.02.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
05.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.01.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.01.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
04.10.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.10.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.06.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 8
02.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
13.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
10.02.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
16.01.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.12.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.12.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
21.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2016 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
29.09.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
29.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
22.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.09.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
25.07.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
25.07.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
25.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.06.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Claims Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.05.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
26.11.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.11.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.11.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.05.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
23.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.10.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
28.07.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.07.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.04.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.04.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.12.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.11.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
29.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.04.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.10.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
01.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
12.09.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.09.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.09.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 6
09.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.05.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.01.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.10.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.08.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.10.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
30.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 7
19.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.04.2010 Notification of withdrawal of international application or designations International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2010 Description International Searching Authority 5
22.03.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1