Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2411464

EP2411464 - POLYOLEFIN MASTERBATCH AND COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR INJECTION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2018/47]
Former [2013/14]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga, 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Former [2012/05]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
via Pergolesi 25
20124 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / CIARAFONI, Marco
Via Risorgimento 84
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
02 / MASSARI, Paola
via E. Farolfi 3
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
03 / BIONDINI, Gisella
via dei Gigli 16
I-44015 Portomaggiore / IT
04 / PANTALEONI, Roberto
Via Nives Gessi 20
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
05 / WILLEMS, Sander
Offenbacher Landstrasse 391
60599 Frankfurt / DE
 [2012/05]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/05]Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
Application number, filing date10709235.519.03.2010
WO2010EP53621
Priority number, dateEP2009015583123.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09155831
US20090211174P27.03.2009         Original published format: US 211174 P
[2012/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010108866
Date:30.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2411464
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2411464
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10, C08L23/12
[2012/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYOLEFIN-MASTERBATCH UND FÜR DEN SPRITZGUSS GEEIGNETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2012/05]
English:POLYOLEFIN MASTERBATCH AND COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR INJECTION MOLDING[2012/05]
French:MÉLANGE-MÈRE POLYOLÉFINIQUE ET COMPOSITION ADAPTÉE AU MOULAGE PAR INJECTION[2012/05]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2011National basic fee paid 
31.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/05]
04.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2013Fee for grant paid
25.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  30.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
14.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition03.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0302/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
01.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0302/17
13.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.03.2010
AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU19.03.2010
AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU19.03.2010
AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/22]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/09]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
GB19.03.2014
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE19.03.2014
LU19.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
LU19.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0228958  (BASELL TECHNOLOGY CO BV [NL]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,8,9 * * page 1, line 1 - line 22 * * page 15 - page 16; examples 1,5,6; tables 1,2 *;
 [AD]WO2004087805  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007003523  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004087805
 EP0045977
 EP0361494
 EP0728769
 EP1272533
 WO0063261
 US4399054
 US4469648
 EP0395083
 WO9844001
 EP1901922
 WO02051912
 EP0782587