Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2406629

EP2406629 - IMMUNO-BASED RETARGETED ENDOPEPTIDASE ACTIVITY ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/03]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Joanne
37 Bristlecone
Irvine CA 92620 / US
02 / ZHU, Hong
11408 Pacific Shores Way
San Diego CA 92130 / US
03 / HODGES, D., Diane
14351 Pinewood Road
Tustin CA 92780 / US
04 / FERNANDEZ-SALAS, Ester
1710 Rocky Road
Fullerton CA 92831 / US
 [2012/03]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/03]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10709360.112.03.2010
WO2010US27244
Priority number, dateUS20090160217P13.03.2009         Original published format: US 160217 P
[2012/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010105236
Date:16.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2406629
Date:18.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010
[2012/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2406629
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2406629
Date:26.03.2014
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, C12Q1/37
[2012/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMMUNBASIERTE TESTVERFAHREN FÜR ENDOPEPTIDASE-AKTIVITÄT MIT NEUEM ZIEL[2012/03]
English:IMMUNO-BASED RETARGETED ENDOPEPTIDASE ACTIVITY ASSAYS[2012/03]
French:DOSAGES IMMUNOLOGIQUES DE L'ACTIVITÉ DES ENDOPEPTIDASES RECIBLÉES[2012/03]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2011National basic fee paid 
22.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/03]
28.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2013Fee for grant paid
05.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12195253.5  / EP2568285
EP12196264.1  / EP2570809
EP17192861.7  / EP3281953
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.06.2014  27.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA
Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100
60318 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2014  27.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA
Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100
60318 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
14.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1913/16
20.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/28]BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
Former [2016/27]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
Former [2016/22]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
Former [2016/12]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU12.03.2014
Former [2014/28]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/18]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
Former [2014/12]CY07.08.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY07.08.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/09]HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9633273  (SPEYWOOD LAB LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 11, lines 21-22 * * example 2 *;
 [Y]WO9533850  (MICROBIOLOGICAL RES AUTHORITY [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 7, paragraph l - page 8, paragraph l * * page 11, paragraph 6; example 4; claims 1,6,9-11,23-25 *;
 [Y]US2004219619  (FERNANDEZ-SALAS ESTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0102] * * paragraphs [0145] - [0152] * * paragraphs [0167] - [0169] *;
 [Y]  - JONES ET AL, "Development of improved SNAP25 endopeptidase immuno-assays for botulinum type A and E toxins", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071023), vol. 329, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 92 - 101, XP022389333 [Y] 1-7 * page 93, column l, lines 6-9 * * page 93, paragraph 2.4 * * page 94, paragraph 2.6 - paragraph 2.8 * * page 95, paragraph 3.1 *
by applicantUS5989545
 US7132259
 US7244437
 US7413742
 US7415338
 US7514088
 US2008064092
 US2009035822
 US2009048431
 US2009162341
 WO2005023309
 WO2008008805
 US7419676
 US2009005313
 US2008241881
 US2004057958
 US7034132
 US7034121
 US5223409
 US5712089
 US5885793
 US5962255
 US5969108
 US6010884
 US6017732
 US6027930
 US6140471
 US6172197
 US4816567
 US5807715
 US6461617
 US6632440
 US6843998
 US2002037833
 US2003180289
 WO0114570
 WO2006059093
 WO2006059105
 US7332567
 US2008160561
 US6265563
 US6432652
 US7282563
 US2008219925
 US5464758
 US5814618
 US5514578
 US6245531
 US5364791
 US5874534
 WO0034308
 US6080724
 US5674980
 US5747641
 US5804604
 US6734167
 US5807746
 US6043339
 US6248558
 US6432680
 US6495518
 US6780843
 US6306993
 US6495663
 US6287817
 US6841535
 US2003008813
 US2004209797
 US2008057575
 US2008138893
 US2007281320
    - S. S. ARNON ET AL., JAMA, (2001), vol. 285, pages 1059 - 1070
    - GUPTA ET AL., VACCINE, (1993), vol. 11, pages 993 - 306
    - Synthetic Vaccines, CRC PRESS, INC., (1987), vol. 1, pages 83 - 92
    - "Vaccine Design, The Subunit and Adjuvant Approach", Pharmaceutical Biotechnology, PLENUM PRESS, vol. 6, pages 141 - 227
    - Monoclonal Antibodies, (1998), pages 196 - 244
    - Growing Hybridomas, (1998), pages 245 - 282
    - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103
    - Immunoprecipitation, pages 421 - 470
    - Immunoblotting, pages 471 - 510
    - Immunoassays, pages 553 - 612
    - PETER J. MUNSON; DAVID RODBARD, "Ligand: A Versatile Computerized Approach For Characterization of Ligand-Binding Systems", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 220 - 239
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - CYRUS CHOTHIA ET AL., "Conformations of Immunoglobulin Hypervariable Regions", NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, no. 6252, pages 877 - 883
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - DAVID J. KING, APPLICATIONS AND ENGINEERING OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES, (1998), page 240
    - NORIKO YOKOSAWA ET AL., "Binding of Clostridium botulinum type C neurotoxin to different neuroblastoma cell lines", INFECT. IMMUN., (1989), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 272 - 277
    - NORIKO YOKOSAWA ET AL., "Binding of botulinum type CI, D and E neurotoxins to neuronal cell lines and synaptosomes", TOXICON, (1991), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 261 - 264
    - TEI-ICHI NISHIKI ET AL., "Identification of protein receptor for Clostridium botulinum type B neurotoxin in rat brain synaptosomes", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 14, pages 10498 - 10503
    - "The receptor and transporter for internalization of Clostridium botulinum type C progenitor toxin into HT-29 cells", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2004), vol. 319, no. 2, pages 327 - 333
    - YUKAKO FUJINAGA ET AL., "Molecular characterization of binding subcomponents of Clostridium botulinum type C progenitor toxin for intestinal epithelial cells and erythrocytes", MICROBIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 150, pages 1529 - 1538
    - A FASSIO ET AL., "Evidence for calcium-dependent vesicular transmitter release insensitive to tetanus toxin and botulinum toxin type F", NEUROSCIENCE, (1999), vol. 90, no. 3, pages 893 - 902
    - SARA STIGLIANI ET AL., "The sensitivity of catecholamine release to botulinum toxin C1 and E suggests selective targeting of vesicles set into the readily releasable pool", J. NEUROCHEM., (2003), vol. 85, no. 2, pages 409 - 421
    - ANTON DE PAIVA ET AL., "A role for the interchain disulfide or its participating thiols in the internalization of botulinum neurotoxin A revealed by a toxin derivative that binds to ecto-acceptors and inhibits transmitter release intracellularly", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, no. 28, pages 20838 - 20844
    - GARY W. LAWRENCE ET AL., "Distinct exocytotic responses of intact and permeabilised chromaffin cells after cleavage of the 25- kDa synaptosomal-associated protein (SNAP-25) or synaptobrevin by botulinum toxin A or B", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 236, no. 3, pages 877 - 886
    - PATRICK FORAN ET AL., "Botulinum neurotoxin C1 cleaves both syntaxin and SNAP-25 in intact and permeabilized chromaffin cells: correlation with its blockade of catecholamine release", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 2630 - 2636
    - Molecular Cloning A Laboratory Manual, (2001), vol. 3
    - ALESSIA COLOSIMO ET AL., "Transfer and Expression of Foreign Genes in Mammalian Cells", BIOTECHNIQUES, (2000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 314 - 318,320-322,324
    - PHILIP WASHBOURNE; A. KIMBERLEY MCALLISTER, "Techniques for Gene Transfer into Neurons", CURR. OPIN. NEUROBIOL., (2002), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 566 - 573
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (2000), pages 9.16.4 - 9.16.11
    - MARTIN JORDAN; FLORIAN WORM, "Transfection of Adherent and Suspended Cells by Calcium Phosphate", METHODS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 136 - 143
    - CHUN ZHANG ET AL., "Polyethylenimine Strategies for Plasmid Delivery to Brain-Derived Cells", METHODS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 144 - 150
    - JEIKE E. BIEWENGA ET AL., "Plasmid-Mediated Gene Transfer in Neurons using the Biolistics Technique", J. NEUROSCI. METHODS, (1997), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 67 - 75
    - JOHN O'BRIEN; SARAH C. R., "Lummis, Biolistic and Diolistic Transfection: Using the Gene Gun to Deliver DNA and Lipophilic Dyes into Mammalian Cells", METHODS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 121 - 125
    - M. GOLZIO ET AL., "In Vitro and In Vivo Electric Field-Mediated Permeabilization, Gene Transfer, and Expression", METHODS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 126 - 135
    - OLIVER GRESCHET, "New Non-Viral Method for Gene Transfer into Primary Cells", METHODS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 151 - 163
    - CHOOI M. LAI ET AL., "Adenovirus and Adeno-Associated Virus Vectors", DNA CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 895 - 913
    - ILYA FROLOV ET AL., "Alphavirus-Based Expression Vectors: Strategies and Applications", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1996), vol. 93, no. 21, pages 11371 - 11377
    - ROLAND WOLKOWICZ ET AL., "Lentiviral Vectors for the Delivery of DNA into Mammalian Cells", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 246, pages 391 - 411
    - A. HUSER; C. HOFMANN, "Baculovirus Vectors: Novel Mammalian Cell Gene-Delivery Vehicles and Their Applications", AM. J. PHARMACOGENOMICS, (2003), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 53 - 63
    - TIZIANA TONINI ET AL., "Transient Production of Retroviral- and Lentiviral-Based Vectors for the Transduction of Mammalian Cells", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 285, pages 141 - 148
    - A. W. KNIGHT, "A Review of Recent Trends in Analytical Applications of EIectrogenerated Chemiluminescence", TRENDS ANAL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 47 - 62
    - K. A. FAHNRICH ET AL., "Recent Applications of Electrogenerated Chemiluminescence in Chemical Analysis", TALANTA, (2001), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 531 - 559
    - COMMONLY USED TECHNIQUES IN MOLECULAR CLONING, pages A8.1 - A8,55
    - DETECTION SYSTEMS, pages A9.1 - A9,49
    - U. B. NIELSEN; B. H. GEIERSTANGER, "Multiplexed Sandwich Assays in Microarray Format", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 290, no. 1-2, pages 107 - 120
    - R. BARRY; M, SOLOVIEV, "Quantitative Protein Profiling using Antibody Arrays", PROTEOMICS, (2004), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 3717 - 3726
    - M. M. LING ET AL., "Multiplexing Molecular Diagnostics and Immunoassays using Emerging Microarray Technologies", EXPERT REV MOL DIAGN., (2007), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 87 - 98
    - S. X. LENG ET AL., "ELISA and Multiplex Technologies for Cytokine Measurement in Inflammation and Aging Research", J GERONTOL A BIOL SCI MED SCI., (2008), vol. 63, no. 8, pages 879 - 884
    - ESTER FERNANDEZ-SALAS ET AL., "Plasma Membrane Localization Signals in the Light Chain of Botulinum Neurotoxin", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, no. 9, pages 3208 - 3213
    - Storing and Purifying Antibodies, (1998), pages 309 - 311
    - PETER AMERSDORFER ET AL., "Molecular Characterization of Murine Humoral Immune Response to Botulinum Neurotoxin Type A Binding Domain as Assessed by Using Phage Antibody Libraries", INFECT. IMMUN., vol. 65, no. 9, pages 3743 - 3752
 US20170611602
 US20070776075
 US20060376696
 US20070829475
 US20070776043
 US20070776052
 US20090403531