Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2411441

EP2411441 - UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2012/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SZKUDLAREK, Marian Henryk
Odenwaldstrasse 25
48527 Nordhorn / DE
02 / JANSEN, Johan Franz Gradus Antonius
Marisstraat 11
NL-6165 AP Geleen / NL
 [2012/13]
Former [2012/05]01 / SZKUDLAREK, Marian Henryk
Langestrasse 8
48529 Nordhorn / DE
02 / JANSEN, Johan Franz Gradus Antonius
Marisstraat 11
NL-6165 AP Geleen / NL
Representative(s)DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/05]Verhaegen, Ilse Maria M.
DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
Application number, filing date10709856.824.03.2010
WO2010EP53847
Priority number, dateEP2009015613125.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09156131
EP2009015613025.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09156130
EP2009015613925.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09156139
EP2009015614225.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09156142
EP2009015613725.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09156137
[2012/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010108962
Date:30.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2411441
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2411441
Date:23.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/03, C09D167/06
[2013/48]
Former International [2012/05]C08G63/52, C09D167/06, C08F283/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNGESÄTTIGTE POLYESTERHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2012/05]
English:UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION[2012/05]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYESTER INSATURÉ[2012/05]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2011National basic fee paid 
25.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2011Examination requested  [2012/05]
08.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2014Fee for grant paid
13.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 [2016/48]
Former [2015/10]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2015   
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Hobel, Klaus, et al
Akzo Nobell N.V.
Intellectual Property
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Amhem / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0204/17
05.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.03.2010
AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MK23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE24.03.2015
LU24.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU24.03.2010
AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE24.03.2015
LU24.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE24.03.2015
LU24.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE24.03.2015
LU24.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
LU24.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
LU24.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY23.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9727253  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 2; example - *;
 [A]US2008220360  (HASEGAWA KUMI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * synthesis example 3 *;
 [A]US2008261131  (NAKAYAMA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * resins H1,H8,H7 *;
 [A]US3477900  (SOUKUP VICTOR G, et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 7,12 *;
 [A]US2008280219  (NAKAYAMA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * resins H4,H6,H7 *;
 [A]  - LAVERTY ET AL, "Hydrosilylation of unsaturated polyesters", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER LETTERS EDITION, WILEY LNKD- DOI:10.1002/POL.1973.130110507, (19730101), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 0360-6384, pages 327 - 332, XP009121504 [A] 1-14 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1973.130110507
ExaminationEP2401337
by applicantGB806730
    - MISEV, Powder Coatings, Chemistry and Technology, JOHN WILEY, (1991), pages 224 - 300
    - K. DIETLIKER; J. V. CRIVELLO, Chemistry and Technology of UV and EB Formulations, SITA TECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 3