Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2392077

EP2392077 - MODEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA OVER A POWER SUPPLY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Power Plus Communications AG
Dudenstraße 6
68167 Mannheim / DE
[2016/32]
Former [2011/49]For all designated states
Power Plus Communications AG
Am Exerzierplatz 2
68167 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FLICKER, Juergen
Hoehenweg 26
69259 Wilhelmsfeld / DE
02 / RINDCHEN, Markus
Goethestrasse 16
67574 Osthofen / DE
 [2011/49]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann
PartG mbB
Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/49]Ullrich & Naumann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date10711822.627.01.2010
WO2010DE00077
Priority number, dateDE2009100700330.01.2009         Original published format: DE102009007003
[2011/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010085938
Date:05.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2392077
Date:07.12.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010
[2011/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/54
[2011/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:MODEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN ÜBER EIN STROMVERSORGUNGSNETZWERK[2011/49]
English:MODEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA OVER A POWER SUPPLY NETWORK[2011/49]
French:MODEM DESTINÉ À LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES PAR UN RÉSEAU D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE[2011/49]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2011National basic fee paid 
30.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/49]
26.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination27.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0902/16
07.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5870016  (SHRESTHA BICKRAM [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 24 * [Y] 10,11,13,14;
 [Y]US2009002094  (RADTKE WILLIAM O [US]) [Y] 10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0036]; figure 3a *;
 [XI]EP1598950  (OXANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,10,12-14 * the whole document * [I] 11