Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2552649

EP2552649 - ASSEMBLY DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alfing Montagetechnik GmbH
Auguste-Kessler-Strasse 20
73433 Aalen / DE
[2013/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ZELLER, Thomas
Kreuzberger Weg 14
73434 Aalen / DE
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/04]
Former [2013/06]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10712426.531.03.2010
WO2010EP54367
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011120579
Date:06.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2552649
Date:06.02.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2552649
Date:21.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/14
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN[2013/06]
English:ASSEMBLY DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY METHOD[2013/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE[2013/06]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2012National basic fee paid 
01.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
16.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2014Fee for grant paid
09.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.10.2015  23.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Atlas Copco Industrial Technique AB
105 23 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB, et al
Drottninggatan 33, plan 4
111 51 Stockholm / SE
 [2017/21]
Former [2015/48]
Opponent(s)01  20.10.2015   
Atlas Copco Industrial Technique AB
105 23 Stockholm / SE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.02.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition18.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0959/17
21.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.01.2015
CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
MK21.01.2015
MT21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
SM21.01.2015
TR21.01.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
IE31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
PT21.05.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]CY21.01.2015
CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
MT21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
SM21.01.2015
TR21.01.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
IE31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
PT21.05.2015
Former [2017/03]CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
MT21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
CH31.03.2015
IE31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2016/12]CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SI21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
CH31.03.2015
IE31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2016/07]CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
CH31.03.2015
IE31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2016/06]CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ21.01.2015
DK21.01.2015
EE21.01.2015
FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
RO21.01.2015
SK21.01.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/47]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
LU31.03.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/46]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
MC21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/39]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
LV21.01.2015
NL21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/38]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
IS21.05.2015
Former [2015/37]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
GR22.04.2015
Former [2015/36]FI21.01.2015
HR21.01.2015
LT21.01.2015
BG21.04.2015
NO21.04.2015
Former [2015/35]LT21.01.2015
NO21.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2067576  (FEIN C & E GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,21 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013]; figure .; claim - *;
 [A]DE4343110  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,21 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 34 *;
 [A]DE4243317  (HINÜBER, EDGAR VON) [A] 1,21 * column 1, line 20 - line 51; figure .- *
by applicantDE4243317
 DE4343110