blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2409172 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2409172



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 554
14.12.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
08.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
08.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 46
19.11.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
10.11.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.11.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
15.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 46
01.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
01.10.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
01.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
01.10.2013 Description Search / examination 2
01.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.01.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.01.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
29.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
29.01.2013 Description Search / examination 5
29.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
29.01.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
29.01.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 29
29.01.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.11.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
01.08.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.12.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.10.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
07.10.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
05.10.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
05.10.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2011 Deficiencies in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.09.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.09.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
20.09.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 2
20.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.09.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.09.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
15.09.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
15.09.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
27.07.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
06.01.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 7
13.10.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
23.09.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 48
20.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission International Searching Authority 1
30.03.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
30.03.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 5
30.03.2010 Description International Searching Authority 30
30.03.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 4
30.03.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 12