Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2409172


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
10.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
08.01.2016 (Expected) grant published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
08.12.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.06.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.08.2012 First examination report published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
31.07.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2012 Change - extension states published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
03.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
23.12.2011 Request for examination filed published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
12.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2011 Amendment by applicant
07.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
22.04.2010 PCT data prior to European publication