Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2409172
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9217788Global Dossier 22.12.2015B2
US2012007779 12.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010IE00014 18.03.2010
IE20090206 19.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2409172Global Dossier 10.02.2016B1
EP2409172 25.01.2012A2
Priority number Date
WO2010IE00014 18.03.2010
IE20090206 19.03.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IE20100162 29.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
IE20100162 18.03.2010
IE20090206 19.03.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010106530Global Dossier 06.01.2011A3
WO2010106530 23.09.2010A2
Priority number Date
IE20090206 19.03.2009