Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2409172

EP2409172 - A LOCATION AND TRACKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): MT
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cork Institute Of Technology
Bishopstown
County Cork / IE
[2012/04]
Inventor(s)01 / KLEPAL, Martin
31A mount Eden
Model Farm Road
Bishopstown
County Cork / IE
02 / WIDYAMAN
c/o Cork Institute of Technology
Bishopstown
County Cork / IE
03 / PESCH, Dirk
Fairview
Fennell's Bay
Crosshaven
County Cork / IE
 [2012/04]
Representative(s)Weldon, Michael James , et al
John A. O'Brien & Associates
Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre
Orchard Lane
Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Weldon, Michael James , et al
John A. O'Brien & Associates
Third Floor
Duncairn House
14 Carysfort Avenue
Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE
Former [2012/04]Weldon, Michael James , et al
John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue
Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE
Application number, filing date10712580.918.03.2010
[2016/06]
WO2010IE00014
Priority number, dateIE2009000020619.03.2009         Original published format: IE 20090206
[2012/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010106530
Date:23.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2409172
Date:25.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010
[2012/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2409172
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/02
[2012/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LOKALISIERUNGS- UND VERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM[2012/04]
English:A LOCATION AND TRACKING SYSTEM[2012/04]
French:SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION ET DE SUIVI[2012/04]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2011National basic fee paid 
15.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
01.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2015Fee for grant paid
10.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
08.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2012
Opposition(s)11.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2010
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
GB10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
[2018/31]
Former [2018/30]HU18.03.2010
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
GB10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.03.2010
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
MK10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
GB10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/47]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
MT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
GB10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/36]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
GB10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/15]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
BG10.05.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/10]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR11.04.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
IE18.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
SM10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT10.02.2016
DK10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
LV10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IS10.06.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
LT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
HR10.02.2016
NO10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2004008796  (EKAHAU OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,22,23 * pages 6-8; figures 1,2,5,7 * [Y] 2-14,16-21 [I] 15;
 [XYI]US2004259575  (PEREZ-BREVA LUIS [ES], et al) [X] 1,22,23 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 4-6 * [Y] 2-5,11-14,16-20 [I] 15;
 [Y]US2007149216  (MISIKANGAS PAULI [FI]) [Y] 2-5,11-14,16-20 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 97] , [ 119] , [ 120]; figure 1 *;
 [YA]WO2007118518  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 21 * page 16, line 18 - page 18, line 7 * * page 20, line 17 - page 21, line 25 * [A] 1
 [Y]  - WIDYAWAN ET AL, "Influence of Predicted and Measured Fingerprint on the Accuracy of RSSI-based Indoor Location Systems", POSITIONING, NAVIGATION AND COMMUNICATION, 2007. WPNC '07. 4TH WO RKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI LNKD- DOI:10.1109/WPNC.2007.353626, (20070301), ISBN 978-1-4244-0870-2, pages 145 - 151, XP031080630 [Y] 2-5,11-14,16-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WPNC.2007.353626
 [Y]  - HOPPE R ET AL, "Wideband propagation modelling for indoor environments and for radio transmission into buildings", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2000. PIMRC 2000. TH E 11TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEPT. 18-21, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000918), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-6463-9, pages 282 - 286, XP010520647 [Y] 6-10 * pages 282-283; figures 2,4; table 1 *