blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2419204 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2419204



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 133
03.08.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.05.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
03.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 6
22.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
19.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
19.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
19.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.11.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
01.11.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.07.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
20.07.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
05.07.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.01.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
09.11.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
21.10.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 28