Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2419527

EP2419527 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A TOXINOGENIC CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE STRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN BOGAARD, Patrick, T., C.
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / VISSER, Astrid, E.
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Coops, Peter , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Kroeze, Johannes Antonius
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10713524.631.03.2010
WO2010IB51396
Priority number, dateEP2009015754707.04.2009         Original published format: EP 09157547
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010116290
Date:14.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2419527
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2419527
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS UND DIE CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES TOXIGENEN CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE-STAMMS[2012/08]
English:METHOD FOR THE DETECTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A TOXINOGENIC CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE STRAIN[2012/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA CARACTÉRISATION D'UNE SOUCHE TOXINOGÈNE DE CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE[2012/08]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2011National basic fee paid 
07.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
15.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2013Fee for grant paid
07.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London, Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  26.03.2014  03.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London, Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  26.03.2014  03.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London, Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  26.03.2014  03.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
ten Haaft, Petrus
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London, Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  26.03.2014  03.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
ten Haaft, Petrus
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London, Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Roques, Sarah Elizabeth
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
06.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition10.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1904/16
30.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2010
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MK26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/32]HU31.03.2010
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/22]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
SM26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
MT26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH31.03.2014
IE31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
IE31.03.2014
LU31.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
LU31.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
IT26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY14.08.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/12]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY14.08.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
ES07.10.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
PL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY14.08.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY14.08.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
LV26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI26.06.2013
HR26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI26.06.2013
LT26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
NO26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT26.06.2013
NO26.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2009030031  (GENEOHM SCIENCES CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1921168  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [XPI]  - ANTIKAINEN JENNI ET AL, "Detection of virulence genes of Clostridium difficile by multiplex PCR.", APMIS : ACTA PATHOLOGICA, MICROBIOLOGICA, ET IMMUNOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA AUG 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19664132, (200908), vol. 117, no. 8, ISSN 1600-0463, pages 607 - 613, XP002585929 [XP] 1-8,10-12 * abstract * * page 608, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 609, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1; table 1 * [I] 9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1600-0463.2009.02509.X
 [I]  - SPIGAGLIA PATRIZIA ET AL, "Molecular analysis of the pathogenicity locus and polymorphism in the putative negative regulator of toxin production (TcdC) among Clostridium difficile clinical isolates.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY SEP 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:12202595, (200209), vol. 40, no. 9, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 3470 - 3475, XP002585930 [I] 1-8,10,12 * abstract * * page 3470, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 3472, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-2; table 1 * * page 3374, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.40.9.3470-3475.2002
 [A]  - PERSSON S ET AL, "New multiplex PCR method for the detection of Clostridium difficile toxin A (tcdA) and toxin B (tcdB) and the binary toxin (cdtA/cdtB) genes applied to a Danish strain collection.", CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTION : THE OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES NOV 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:19040478, (200811), vol. 14, no. 11, ISSN 1469-0691, pages 1057 - 1064, XP002585931 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1058, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 1059, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * * page 1060, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1061, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1469-0691.2008.02092.X
 [A]  - SLOAN LYNNE M ET AL, "Comparison of real-time PCR for detection of the tcdC gene with four toxin immunoassays and culture in diagnosis of Clostridium difficile infection.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY JUN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18434563, (200806), vol. 46, no. 6, ISSN 1098-660X, pages 1996 - 2001, XP002585932 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1997, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 1998, column 2, paragraph 5; table 1 * * page 2000, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.00032-08
 [A]  - LEMEE LUDOVIC ET AL, "Multiplex PCR targeting tpi (triose phosphate isomerase), tcdA (Toxin A), and tcdB (Toxin B) genes for toxigenic culture of Clostridium difficile.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY DEC 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15583303, (200412), vol. 42, no. 12, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 5710 - 5714, XP002585933 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5710, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 5711, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.12.5710-5714.2004
 [A]  - COHEN STUART H ET AL, "Analysis of the pathogenicity locus in Clostridium difficile strains", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (200002), vol. 181, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 659 - 663, XP002585934 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FENNER L ET AL, "Epidemiology of Clostridium difficile-associated disease at University Hospital Basel including molecular characterisation of the isolates 2006-2007.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY & INFECTIOUS DISEASES : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY DEC 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18560909, (200812), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 1435-4373, pages 1201 - 1207, XP002585935 [A] 1-12 * page 1202, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 1203, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 1204, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S10096-008-0564-9
 [AP]  - WOLFF D ET AL, "Rapid detection of the Clostridium difficile ribotype 027 tcdC gene frame shift mutation at position 117 by real-time PCR and melt curve analysis.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY & INFECTIOUS DISEASES : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AUG 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19333630, (200908), vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 1435-4373, pages 959 - 962, XP002585936 [AP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 960, column 2; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S10096-009-0731-7
ExaminationWO2009100215