Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2403484

EP2403484 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A FERMENTED, DEHYDRATED MATERIAL WITH AMORPHOUS CRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hidvégi, Máté
Hegedûs Gyula u. 63
1133 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
BIROPHARMA Elsö Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft.
IV, sector 6
6413 Kunfehértó / HU
For all designated states
TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyártó és Kereskedelmi Kft
Röppentyu u. 48
1139 Budapest / HU
[2015/51]
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Hidvégi, Máté
Hegedûs Gyula u. 63
1133 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
BIROPHARMA Elsö Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft.
IV, sector 6
6413 Kunfehértó / HU
For all designated states
TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyártó és Kereskedelmi Kft
Röppentyu u. 48
1139 Budapest / HU
Former [2013/50]For all designated states
Hidvégi, Maté
Heged s Gyula u. 63
1133 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
BIROPHARMA Elso Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft.
IV, sector 6
6413 Kunfehértó / HU
For all designated states
TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyáró és Kereskedelmi Kft.
Röppentyu u. 48
1139 Budapest / HU
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
Hidvégi, Maté
Heged s Gyula u. 63
1133 Budapest / HU
Inventor(s)01 / HIDVEGI Maté
Hegedüs Gyula u. 63
1133 Budapest / HU
 [2015/25]
Former [2012/02]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Derzsi, Katalin , et al
SBG&K Patent and Law Offices
Andrássy ut 113
1062 Budapest / HU
[2015/51]
Former [2014/40](deleted)
...
Former [2014/13]Marmarosi, Tamasné
Ybl Miklós sétány, 19
2051 Biatorbágy / HU
Former [2013/50]Lang, Tivadarné , et al
S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices Andrassy ut 113.
H-1062 Budapest / HU
Former [2012/02]Marmarosi, Tamasné
Ybl Miklós sétány, 19
2051 Biatorbágy / HU
Application number, filing date10714064.203.03.2010
[2015/51]
WO2010HU00025
Priority number, dateUS20090209200P03.03.2009         Original published format: US 209200 P
HU2009000061429.09.2009         Original published format: HU 0900614
[2012/24]
Former [2012/02]US20090612092P03.03.2009
HU2009000061429.09.2009
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010100514
Date:10.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2403484
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2403484
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/19
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM FERMENTIERTEN DEHYDRIERTEN MATERIAL MIT AMORPHER KRISTALLINER STRUKTUR[2012/02]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A FERMENTED, DEHYDRATED MATERIAL WITH AMORPHOUS CRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE[2012/02]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT UNE MATIÈRE DÉSHYDRATÉE, FERMENTÉE AVEC UNE STRUCTURE CRISTALLINE AMORPHE[2012/02]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2011National basic fee paid 
23.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
21.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2013Observations by third parties
10.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2015Fee for grant paid
21.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2013
Opposition(s)19.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201506   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2015
Licence(s)ID:01 01/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR]
Licencee:BIROPHARMA Elso Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft.
IV, sector 6
6413 Kunfehértó / HU
Date:18.09.2013
[2014/03]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
BG16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2018/30]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
TR16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2018/28]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CY16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MK16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/47]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
MT16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/15]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SI16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
IE03.03.2016
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.12.2015
BE16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
MC16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
PL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/47]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
LU03.03.2016
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
DK16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
SM16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS16.04.2016
PT18.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT16.12.2015
CZ16.12.2015
EE16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
IT16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
RO16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
SK16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ16.12.2015
ES16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ16.12.2015
FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
NL16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
LV16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI16.12.2015
HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
GR17.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR16.12.2015
LT16.12.2015
SE16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT16.12.2015
NO16.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT16.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9908694  (HIDVEGI MATE [HU]; TOEMOESKOEZINE FARKAS RITA [HU]; LAPIS KAROLY [HU];) [X] 1-19 * page 4, line 21 - line 24 * * example 2 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [XI]US2005281898  (SUGIYAMA TSUYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,10-19 * paragraphs [0041] , [0044] - [0048] - [0078] * * example 1 * * claim 1 * [I] 4-9;
 [A]WO2004014406  (AKOS R) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08337536
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 10, Database accession no. 1997-103658, XP002260818 & JPH08337536 A 19961224 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
by applicant   - CANCER BIOTHER RADIOPHARM., (200808), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 477 - 82
    - CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2006), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 325 - 8
    - BR J CANCER, (20030804), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 465 - 9
    - TOMAYKO M.M.; REYNOLDS C.P., "Determination of subcutaneons tumor size in athymic (nude) mice", CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACOL., (1989), vol. 24, pages 148 - 154
other   - "Lumbika(ulumba)", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/989, XP003031996
    - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, (1979), page 433
    - "Hriday Rog Nashak Yog 02", TKDL, Database accession no. SK/15, XP003031997
    - Ayurveda Vigyana sara, (1976), page 13
    - "Zimaad-e- Mufajjir Bara-e- Salaat", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3930, XP003031998
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Ilaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 341
    - "Zaroor", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1856I, XP003031999
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Ikseer Azam, (1872), vol. IV, pages 309 - 310
    - "Ksayaharakapadarthah", TKDL, Database accession no. RG/4109, XP003032000
    - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara, (1996), vol. 3, page 138, V
    - "Zimaad", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1856I1, XP003031027
    - "Aabkaama", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1025A, XP003031028
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), pages 152 - 153
    - "Ratnakararasah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2123, XP003031029
    - GOVINDA DASA, Bhaisajya Ratnavali, (2001), page 490
    - "Halwa Maghz-e- Sar Kanjashk", TKDL, Database accession no. MA3/181, XP003027321
    - MOHAMMAD KABIRUDDIN, Bayaaz-e- Kabir, (1938), vol. II, pages 59 - 60
    - "Sitakalyanakaghrtam", TKDL, Database accession no. RG8/1513, XP003031030
    - Yogaratnakarah, (2004), pages 400 - 401
    - "Godhumadyamghrtam", TKDL, Database accession no. BP/250, XP003031031
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, (199908), vol. II, page 54