EP2403484 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A FERMENTED, DEHYDRATED MATERIAL WITH AMORPHOUS CRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidvégi, Máté Hegedûs Gyula u. 63 1133 Budapest / HU | For all designated states BIROPHARMA Elsö Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft. IV, sector 6 6413 Kunfehértó / HU | For all designated states TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyártó és Kereskedelmi Kft Röppentyu u. 48 1139 Budapest / HU | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Hidvégi, Máté Hegedûs Gyula u. 63 1133 Budapest / HU | ||
For all designated states BIROPHARMA Elsö Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft. IV, sector 6 6413 Kunfehértó / HU | |||
For all designated states TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyártó és Kereskedelmi Kft Röppentyu u. 48 1139 Budapest / HU | |||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Hidvégi, Maté Heged s Gyula u. 63 1133 Budapest / HU | ||
For all designated states BIROPHARMA Elso Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft. IV, sector 6 6413 Kunfehértó / HU | |||
For all designated states TÁPSZER Élelmiszeripari Gyáró és Kereskedelmi Kft. Röppentyu u. 48 1139 Budapest / HU | |||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Hidvégi, Maté Heged s Gyula u. 63 1133 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDVEGI Maté Hegedüs Gyula u. 63 1133 Budapest / HU | [2015/25] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Derzsi, Katalin, et al SBG&K Patent and Law Offices Andrássy ut 113 1062 Budapest / HU | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2014/13] | Marmarosi, Tamasné Ybl Miklós sétány, 19 2051 Biatorbágy / HU | ||
Former [2013/50] | Lang, Tivadarné, et al S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices Andrassy ut 113. H-1062 Budapest / HU | ||
Former [2012/02] | Marmarosi, Tamasné Ybl Miklós sétány, 19 2051 Biatorbágy / HU | Application number, filing date | 10714064.2 | 03.03.2010 | [2015/51] | WO2010HU00025 | Priority number, date | US20090209200P | 03.03.2009 Original published format: US 209200 P | HU20090000614 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: HU 0900614 | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/02] | US20090612092P | 03.03.2009 | |
HU20090000614 | 29.09.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010100514 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2403484 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403484 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/19 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
A61K36/899 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM FERMENTIERTEN DEHYDRIERTEN MATERIAL MIT AMORPHER KRISTALLINER STRUKTUR | [2012/02] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A FERMENTED, DEHYDRATED MATERIAL WITH AMORPHOUS CRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE | [2012/02] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT UNE MATIÈRE DÉSHYDRATÉE, FERMENTÉE AVEC UNE STRUCTURE CRISTALLINE AMORPHE | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 21.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2013 | Observations by third parties | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | BIROPHARMA Elso Magyar Biotechnológiai Kft. IV, sector 6 6413 Kunfehértó / HU | Date: | 18.09.2013 | [2014/03] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | IE | 03.03.2016 | LU | 03.03.2016 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MT | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2016 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08337536 ; | [X]WO9908694 (HIDVEGI MATE [HU], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 4, line 21 - line 24 * * example 2 * * claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO2004014406 (HIDVEGI MATE [HU], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2005281898 (SUGIYAMA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10-19 * paragraphs [0041] , [0044] - [0048] - [0078] * * example 1 * * claim 1 * [I] 4-9; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 10, Database accession no. 1997-103658, XP002260818 & JPH08337536 A 19961224 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | by applicant | - CANCER BIOTHER RADIOPHARM., (200808), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 477 - 82 | - CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2006), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 325 - 8 | - BR J CANCER, (20030804), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 465 - 9 | - TOMAYKO M.M.; REYNOLDS C.P., "Determination of subcutaneons tumor size in athymic (nude) mice", CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACOL., (1989), vol. 24, pages 148 - 154 | other | - "Lumbika(ulumba)", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/989, XP003031996 | - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, (1979), page 433 | - "Hriday Rog Nashak Yog 02", TKDL, Database accession no. SK/15, XP003031997 | - Ayurveda Vigyana sara, (1976), page 13 | - "Zimaad-e- Mufajjir Bara-e- Salaat", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3930, XP003031998 | - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Ilaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 341 | - "Zaroor", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1856I, XP003031999 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Ikseer Azam, (1872), vol. IV, pages 309 - 310 | - "Ksayaharakapadarthah", TKDL, Database accession no. RG/4109, XP003032000 | - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara, (1996), vol. 3, page 138, V | - "Zimaad", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/1856I1, XP003031027 | - "Aabkaama", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1025A, XP003031028 | - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), pages 152 - 153 | - "Ratnakararasah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK/2123, XP003031029 | - GOVINDA DASA, Bhaisajya Ratnavali, (2001), page 490 | - "Halwa Maghz-e- Sar Kanjashk", TKDL, Database accession no. MA3/181, XP003027321 | - MOHAMMAD KABIRUDDIN, Bayaaz-e- Kabir, (1938), vol. II, pages 59 - 60 | - "Sitakalyanakaghrtam", TKDL, Database accession no. RG8/1513, XP003031030 | - Yogaratnakarah, (2004), pages 400 - 401 | - "Godhumadyamghrtam", TKDL, Database accession no. BP/250, XP003031031 | - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, (199908), vol. II, page 54 |