Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2419066

EP2419066 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES COMPRISING WETNESS INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KLOFTA, Thomas, James
10404 Hopewell Hills Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45249 / US
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date10714522.913.04.2010
WO2010US30791
Priority number, dateUS20090168756P13.04.2009         Original published format: US 168756 P
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010120705
Date:21.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2419066
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2419066
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/532, A61F13/536, A61F13/42
[2012/35]
Former International [2012/08]A61F13/15, A61F13/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSINDIKATOR[2012/35]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLES COMPRISING WETNESS INDICATORS[2012/08]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT DES INDICATEURS D HUMIDITE[2012/51]
Former [2012/08]SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL MIT NÄSSE-INDIKATOREN
Former [2012/08]ARTICLES ABSORBANTS COMPRENANT DES INDICATEURS D'HUMIDITÉ
Entry into regional phase21.09.2011National basic fee paid 
21.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
16.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2012Fee for grant paid
06.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.09.2013  27.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2018/28]
Former [2013/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2013   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0164/16
23.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
09.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT13.04.2018
PL13.04.2018
ES14.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
NL01.05.2018
[2020/01]
Former [2019/47]HU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT13.04.2018
ES14.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
NL01.05.2018
Former [2019/23]HU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT13.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
NL01.05.2018
Former [2019/21]HU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT13.04.2018
NL01.05.2018
Former [2019/09]HU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NL01.05.2018
Former [2015/34]HU13.04.2010
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/32]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/24]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/13]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2014/20]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IE13.04.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/52]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/48]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/40]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/37]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/36]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/35]BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/34]BE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/33]BE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003164136  (KLOFTA THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-16 *;
 [A]US2005199177  (KLOFTA THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-19 *;
 [A]US2003154904  (KLOFTA THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-20 *;
 [A]WO2008155722  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantUS2004162536
 US2007167928
 US2007179464
 US2007156108
 US2004167486
 US5246433
 US5569234
 US6120487
 US6120489
 US4940464
 US5092861
 US2003233082
 US5897545
 US5957908
 US6904865
 US3860003
 US5151092
 US5221274
 US5554145
 US5580411
 US6004306
 US5938648
 US5865823
 US5571096
 US5518801
 US4573986
 US3929135
 US4463045
 US4609518
 US4629643
 US5037416
 US5269775
 US4610678
 US4673402
 US4888231
 US5342338
 US5260345
 US5026364
 US3848594
 US4846815
 US4946527
 US4963140
 US4699622
 US5591152
 US4938753
 US5669897
 US4808178
 US4909803
 US4695278
 US4795454
 US7318820
 US6962578
 US7377914
 US7320684
 US5607760
 US5609587
 US5635191
 US5643588
 US5968025
 US4022211
 US6297424
 US6307119
 US2002007162
 US2001053898
 WO0076438
 WO0076443
 US20070936102
 US20070936109
 US20070936149
 US20070936085
 US20070936084
 US20070936150
 US20070936146
 US20070936037
 US20080091799
 US20050197197
 US20050224462
 US20050286614
 US20050286612
 US20070709500
 US20040770043
 US20070715976
 US20040880128
 US20050131799
 US20050133818
 US20050135689
 US20050140888
 US20050158563
 US20050159916
 US20050210345
 US20050231511
 US20050231512
 US20050231500
 US20050286934
 US20070700585
 US20070713906
 US20070728127
 US20080073154
 US20080073169