Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2419702

EP2419702 - INFRARED LIGHT SENSOR HAVING A HIGH SIGNAL VOLTAGE AND A HIGH SIGNAL/NOISE RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.09.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pyreos Ltd.
West Mains Road
EH9 3JF Edinburgh / GB
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / GIEBELER, Carsten
43 Barnton Park Avenue
Edinburgh EH4 6HD / GB
02 / WRIGHT, Jeffrey
24 Campie Road
Musselburgh
East Lothian EH21 6QC / GB
03 / CHAMBERLAIN, Tim
86/2 Comely Bank Avenue
Edinburgh EH4 1HE / GB
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Fischer, Ernst
Pateris Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Altheimer Eck 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date10714629.216.04.2010
WO2010EP55062
Priority number, dateDE2009101784517.04.2009         Original published format: DE102009017845
[2012/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010119131
Date:21.10.2010
Language:DE
[2010/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2419702
Date:22.02.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010
[2012/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01J5/34, G01J5/08
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
TitleGerman:INFRAROTLICHTSENSOR MIT HOHER SIGNALSPANNUNG UND HOHEM SIGNAL- RAUSCH-VERHÄLTNIS[2012/08]
English:INFRARED LIGHT SENSOR HAVING A HIGH SIGNAL VOLTAGE AND A HIGH SIGNAL/NOISE RATIO[2012/08]
French:CAPTEUR DE LUMIÈRE INFRAROUGE AVEC TENSION DE SIGNAL ÉLEVÉE ET RAPPORT SIGNAL-BRUIT ÉLEVÉ[2012/08]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2011National basic fee paid 
28.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
18.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2016
20.09.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.11.2016Appeal received No.  T0608/17
21.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2008315100  (HAN HUI [US] ET AL HAN HUI [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figures 3-5 * [I] 1-10;
 [A]US3842276  (SOUTHGATE P) [A] 1-10 * columns 2-3; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4441023  (DOCTOR ALAN P [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 4; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2008179525  (IKUSHIMA KIMIYA [JP] ET AL) [A] 6-10 * figures 1a,1b *