Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2418936

EP2418936 - A MILKING PARLOUR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2017/42]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Mats
Scheelevägen 27
147 31 Tumba / SE
 [2018/08]
Former [2012/08]01 / NILSSON, Mats
Scheelevägen 27
S-147 31 Tumba / SE
Representative(s)Lilliehorn, Tobias , et al
DeLaval International AB
Intellectual Property Support
Legal Affairs
P.O.Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2018/08]
Former [2012/08]Bennett, Adrian Robert J. , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
Mechanical
235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date10715785.114.04.2010
[2018/08]
WO2010EP54911
Priority number, dateEP2009015809216.04.2009         Original published format: EP 09158092
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010119079
Date:21.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2418936
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2418936
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
Supplementary international search report - requested on:RU15.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/12
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MELKSTAND UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER BEDIENUNG[2017/50]
English:A MILKING PARLOUR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME[2012/08]
French:SALLE DE TRAITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2017/50]
Former [2012/08]MELKSTANDANLAGE UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN HIERFÜR
Former [2012/08]SALLE DE TRAITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT
Entry into regional phase03.11.2011National basic fee paid 
03.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/08]
25.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2018Fee for grant paid
11.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
LU14.04.2018
MT14.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
LU14.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2019/08]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
LU14.04.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
IT21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US6050219  (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS [CH]) [X] 1,13 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 41; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2007142586  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 3-10; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9422292  (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-7 *;
 [XP]EP2060171  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
Supplementary international search report[A]SU1777728  (INST MASH IM A A BLAGONRAVOVA [SU]);
 [A]RU2244417  ;
 [A]SU1281219  (FOMIN LEONID U)