Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2391626

EP2391626 - SUBSTITUTED 6-(2-AMINOBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
BioApex, s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
[2014/40]
Former [2011/49]For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Bio Apex S.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / HAVLICEK, Libor
Makovskeho 1177
16300 Praha 6 / CZ
02 / KRYSTOF, Vladimir
Varsavske nam. 7
77900 Olomouc / CZ
03 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
78701 Sumperk / CZ
04 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
78365 Hlubocky / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
77900 Olomouc / CZ
06 / VOJTESEK, Borivoj
Sadova 572
66442 Modrice / CZ
 [2011/49]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2011/49]
Application number, filing date10716265.322.01.2010
WO2010CZ00004
Priority number, dateCZ2009000004528.01.2009         Original published format: CZ 20090045
[2011/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010085924
Date:05.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2391626
Date:07.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010
[2011/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2391626
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search reportEP30.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/16, A61K31/52
[2011/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 6-(2-AMINOBENZYLAMINO)PURIN-DERIVATE, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE UND ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT DIESEN VERBINDUNGEN[2011/49]
English:SUBSTITUTED 6-(2-AMINOBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS[2011/49]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE 6-(2-AMINOBENZYLAMINO)PURINE SUBSTITUÉE, UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI EN TANT QUE MÉDICAMENTS, ET PRÉPARATIONS CONTENANT CES COMPOSÉS[2011/49]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2011National basic fee paid 
18.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/49]
05.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2014Fee for grant paid
29.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2014
Opposition(s)02.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2010
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/38]HU22.01.2010
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2017/03]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/12]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
NL01.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[ID]  - KRYSTOF V ET AL, "Antiproliferative activity of olomoucine II, a novel 2,6,9-trisubstituted purine cyclin-dependent kinase inhibitor", CMLS CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES, BIRKHÄUSER-VERLAG, BA LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00018-005-5185-1, (20050801), vol. 62, no. 15, ISSN 1420-9071, pages 1763 - 1771, XP019200801 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-005-5185-1
 [ID]  - PRERNA DIWAN, "Roscovitine Inhibits Activation of Promoters in Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 Genomes Independently of Promoter-Specific Factors", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20040901), vol. 78, no. 17, pages 9352 - 9365, XP002589285 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.17.9352-9365.2004
by applicant   - KNOCKAERT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 25493 - 25501,
    - DE AZEVEDO ET AL., EUR.J.BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 243, pages 518 - 526,
    - LOSIEWICZ ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 201, no. 2, pages 589 - 95,
    - VESELý ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 224, pages 771 - 786,
    - HAVLICEK ET AL., J. MED.CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 408 - 412,
    - KRYSTOF ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2002), vol. 12, pages 3283 - 3286,
    - KRYSTOF ET AL., CELL MOL LIFE SCI., (2005), vol. 62, pages 1763 - 1771,
    - DIWAN ET AL., J VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 9352 - 65,
    - BRESNAHAN ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1997), vol. 78, pages 1993 - 7,
    - SCHANG ET AL., J VIROL., (1999), vol. 73, pages 2161 - 72,
    - SCHANG ET AL., ANTIVIR. CHEM. CHEMOTHER., (2006), vol. 17, pages 293 - 320,
    - KAPASI; SPECTOR, J. VIROL., (2008), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 394 - 407,
    - DIWAN ET AL., J. VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 9352 - 65,
    - NICHOLL; PRESTON, J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 6336 - 9,
    - MANDAL ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 217 - 225,
    - DAVOLL; BLOWY, J AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 1957, no. 73, page 2936,
    - PARKER ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 25, pages 303 - 310,
    - BRIK ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 13, pages 4622 - 4626,
    - PITTS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (2004), vol. 14, pages 2955 - 2958,
    - RYPKA ET AL., XENOBIOTICA, (2002), vol. 32, pages 1017 - 1032,
    - LU ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 5012 - 5015 5,
    - KELLEY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 2001 - 2004,
    - NAITO ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BUL., (1982), vol. 30, pages 2011 - 2019,
    - DALBY ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. GERMAN, (1993), vol. 105, pages 1822 - 1823,
    - WETERINGS ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (2006), vol. 16, pages 3258 - 3261,
    - TOYOTA ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 23, pages 1295 - 1305,
    - GUNDERSEN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LET., (1995), vol. 36, pages 1945 - 1948,
    - LU ET AL., J. ORGAN. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 5012 - 5015,
    - SHUM ET AL., NUCLEOS. NUCLEOT, (2001), vol. 20, pages 1067 - 1078,
    - DREZER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 524 - 530,
    - FREBUNG ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 52, pages 1992 - 6976,
    - CHANG ET AL., GENE THER., (1999), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 715 - 28,
    - MCSHARRY ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (2003), vol. 84, pages 2511 - 62003,
    - MATROSOVICH ET AL., VIROL. J., (2006), vol. 3, page 63,
    - SCHANG, J. ANTIMICROB. CHEMOTHER., (2002), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 779 - 92,
    - ZALVIDE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 1408 - 15,
    - ALI ET AL., J VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 2749 - 57,
    - CHAO ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20000915), vol. 275, no. 37, pages 28345 - 8,