blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2421777

EP2421777 - ZONED ACCUMULATION CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.11.2017
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2024Change: Appeal number 
05.06.2024Deletion: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intelligrated Headquarters LLC
7901 Innovation Way
Mason, OH 45040 / US
[2012/09]
Inventor(s)01 / NEISER, Raymond, R.
1708 Clough Pike
Batavia, OH 45103 / US
 [2013/44]
Former [2012/09]01 / NEISER, Raymond, R.
1708 Clough Pike
Batavia OH 45103 / US
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Düsseldorf Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiserswerther Straße 183
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2012/09]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date10716654.819.03.2010
WO2010US27983
Priority number, dateUS20090210750P19.03.2009         Original published format: US 210750 P
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2010108097
Date:23.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2421777
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2421777
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:B65G47/26
[2012/09]
CPC:
B65G47/268 (EP,US); B65G47/26 (KR); B65G43/08 (KR);
B65G47/261 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STAUFÖRDERER MIT MEHREREN BEREICHEN[2013/44]
English:ZONED ACCUMULATION CONVEYOR[2012/09]
French:CONVOYEUR ACCUMULATEUR A PLUSIEURS ZONES[2013/44]
Former [2012/09]ZONEN-STAU-FÖRDERER
Former [2012/09]CONVOYEUR À ACCUMULATION COMPARTIMENTÉ EN ZONES
Entry into regional phase18.10.2011National basic fee paid 
18.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
17.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
17.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
02.06.2014Fee for grant paid
02.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.04.2015  15.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SSI Schäfer Peem GmbH
Fischeraustrasse 27
8051 Graz / AT
Opponent's representative
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
 02  15.04.2015    ADMISSIBLE
Vanderlande Industries B.V.
Vanderlandelaan 2
5466 RB Veghel / NL
Opponent's representative
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/21]
21.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0423/18
09.02.2018Payment of appeal fee
06.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.06.2022Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
23.08.2022Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
03.06.2024Appeal received No.  T0781/24
03.06.2024Payment of appeal fee
29.05.2024Appeal received No.  T0781/24
29.05.2024Payment of appeal fee
06.02.2024Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
02.06.2014Request for further processing filed
02.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.03.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
AT19.03.2019
DK31.03.2020
[2021/20]
Former [2020/10]HU19.03.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
AT19.03.2019
Former [2018/30]HU19.03.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU19.03.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE19.03.2015
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU19.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU19.03.2015
Former [2015/47]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU19.03.2015
Former [2015/46]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2007119690  (LUPTON CLINTON R [US]) [X] 1-8,10-12,18,19 * page 3, column 2, line 8 - page 4, column 1, line 18; figure -; claim - * [A] 20,29,36;
 [XA]US5862907  (TAYLOR BRYAN D [US]) [X] 1-6,10,12,18 * column 5, line 63 - column 14, line 9; figure -; claim - * [A] 20,29,36;
 [XA]US6405851  (TAKEDA MASATO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 8, line 23 - column 10, line 53; figure -; claim - * [A] 12,20,29,36;
 [A]US4109783  (VOGT ROBERT K) [A] 1,6,12,20,29,36 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 61; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2006289279  (TAYLOR BRYAN D [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2003168316  (KNEPPLE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.