Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2422207

EP2422207 - HIGH MAGNETIC FIELD COMPATIBLE INTERVENTIONAL NEEDLE WITH INTEGRATED PASSIVE L-C CIRCUIT FOR NEEDLE POSITION TRACKING IN MRI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2013/39]
Former [2012/09]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KLEE, Mareike
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / WINKEL, Axel
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / MILLS, John, B.
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / DEKKER, Ronald
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / HENDRIKS, Bernardus, H., W.
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10716890.813.04.2010
WO2010IB51581
Priority number, dateEP2009015823220.04.2009         Original published format: EP 09158232
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010122443
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2422207
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/28
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:MIT HOCHMAGNETISCHEM FELD KOMPATIBLE INTERVENTIONELLE NADEL MIT INTEGRIERTEM PASSIVEM L-C-SCHWINGKREIS ZUR NADELPOSITIONSVERFOLGUNG BEI MRI[2012/09]
English:HIGH MAGNETIC FIELD COMPATIBLE INTERVENTIONAL NEEDLE WITH INTEGRATED PASSIVE L-C CIRCUIT FOR NEEDLE POSITION TRACKING IN MRI[2012/09]
French:AIGUILLE D'INTERVENTION COMPATIBLE AVEC UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE ÉLEVÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SUIVI D'AIGUILLE INTÉGRÉ[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2011National basic fee paid 
21.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
07.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination23.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0507/15
25.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - ELLERSIEK D ET AL, "A monolithically fabricated flexible resonant circuit for catheter tracking in magnetic resonance imaging", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.SNB.2009.03.026, vol. 144, no. 2, ISSN 0925-4005, (20090326), pages 432 - 436, (20090326), XP026888324 [X] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 12,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2009.03.026
 [XI]  - T.KUEHNE ET AL., "Catheter Visualization with Resonant Markers at MR Imaging-guided Deployment of Endovascular Stents in Swine", RADIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 233, pages 774 - 780, XP002589501 [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * see pages 774-776,779,780 * [I] 2,3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/RADIOL.2333031710
 [X]  - TH UELZEN ET AL, "Mechanical and electrical properties of electroplated copper for MR-imaging coils", MICROSYSTEM TECHNOLOGIES ; MICRO AND NANOSYSTEMS INFORMATION STORAGE AND PROCESSING SYSTEMS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00542-005-0069-8, (20060301), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1432-1858, pages 343 - 351, XP019349549 [X] 1-5,9,10 * see chapters 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00542-005-0069-8
 [XI]  - WEISS S ET AL, "MR-controlled fast optical switching of a resonant circuit mounted to the tip of a clinical catheter", INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION. PROCEEDINGS, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, US, (20010421), vol. 9, ISSN 1524-6965, page 544, XP002273670 [X] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 4
 [I]  - SYMS R R A ET AL, "Microengineered needle micro-coils for magnetic resonance spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS & MICROENGINEERING, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1088/0960-1317/16/12/032, (20061201), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 0960-1317, pages 2755 - 2764, XP020104868 [I] 10-14 * see chapters 1 and 4-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/16/12/032
 [I]  - RENAUD L ET AL, "Implantable planar rf microcoils for NMR microspectroscopy", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0924-4247(01)00914-1, (20020605), vol. 99, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 244 - 248, XP004361689 [I] 10-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(01)00914-1
by applicant   - SUN C K; NGUYEN R; ALBARES D J; CHANG C T, "Photo-injection back-to-back PIN switch for RF control", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19970828), vol. 33, no. 18, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19971044, pages 1579 - 1580, XP006007902

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19971044
    - JACOBS E W; FOGLIATTI D W; NGUYEN H; ALBARES D J; CHANG C T; SUN C K, "Photo-Injection p-i-n Diode Switch for High-Power RF Switching", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (2002), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 413 - 419