Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2422515

EP2422515 - DIGITAL VIDEO RECORDER RECORDING AND RENDERING PROGRAMS FORMED FROM SPLICED SEGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.06.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARRIS Enterprises LLC
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee, GA 30024 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2016/13]For all designated states
Arris Enterprises, Inc.
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US
Former [2015/38]For all designated states
Arris Technology, Inc.
3871 Lakefield Drive
Suwanee GA 30024 / US
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
General instrument Corporation
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Yeqing
13 Barrel Stave Circle
Horsham PA 19044 / US
02 / DEL SORDO, Christoper, S.
229 Heatherfield Drive
Souderton PA 18964 / US
03 / SCHMITT, Ernest, G.
932 Whitney Lane
Maple Glen PA 19002 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Openshaw, Paul Malcolm , et al
Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham
Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
Application number, filing date10717339.513.04.2010
WO2010US30796
Priority number, dateUS2009042862523.04.2009         Original published format: US 428625
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010123713
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2422515
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/76, G11B27/10, H04N7/24, H04N9/82
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:AUS GESPLEISSTEN SEGMENTEN GEBILDETE AUFZEICHNUNGS- UND WIEDERGABEPROGRAMME EINES DIGITALEN VIDEORECODERS[2012/09]
English:DIGITAL VIDEO RECORDER RECORDING AND RENDERING PROGRAMS FORMED FROM SPLICED SEGMENTS[2012/09]
French:ENREGISTREUR VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUE ENREGISTRANT ET EFFECTUANT UN RENDU DE PROGRAMMES FORMÉS À PARTIR DE SEGMENTS COLLÉS[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2011National basic fee paid 
23.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
04.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0864/15
02.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
17.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.05.2014Request for further processing filed
30.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.06.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.07.2013Request for further processing filed
01.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - Anonymous, "The Advanced Internet Radio Recorder V2.30-V2.33 - change log", (20080622), StationRipper, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080622152414/http://www.stationripper.com/version/pages/V2.33_ChangeLog.htm, (20100625), XP002588836 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Cue Sheet from Hydrogenaudio Knowledgebase", (20080822), Wikipedia, the Free Encyclopedia, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080822101630/http://wiki.hydrogenaudio.org/index.php?title=Cuesheet, (20100625), XP002588837 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [XOY]  - "Foobar2000 Software", INTERNET CITATION, (20071029), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071029221004/http://www.foobar2000.org/index.html, (20100624), XP055074332 [XO] 14-19 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13
 [XOY]  - "StationRipper Software", INTERNET CITATION, (20080822), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080822030331/http://www.stationripper.com/, (20100624), XP055074335 [XO] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13
 [XOY]  - "Streamripper Software", INTERNET CITATION, (20080325), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080325100111/http://streamripper.sourceforge.net/, (20100624), XP055074336 [XO] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13
by applicant   - ANONYMOUS, THE ADVANCED INTERNET RADIO RECORDER V2.30-V2.33 - CHANGE LOG, (20080622), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080622152414/http://www.stationripper.com/vers ion/pages/V2.33_ChangeLog.htm
    - FOOBAR2000 SOFTWARE, (20071029), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071029221004/http://www.foobar2000.org/index. html
    - STATIONRIPPER SOFTWARE, (20080822), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080822030331/http://www.stationripper.com