Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2430861

EP2430861 - ALLOCATING TRANSMIT POWER AMONG MULTIPLE AIR INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2012/12]
Inventor(s)01 / HU, Jun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / LIN, Yu-Chuan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / SHAHIDI, Reza
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / RAMASAMI, Vijaya, C.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / GARACH, Ravindra, M.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstraße 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date10718010.107.05.2010
WO2010US34010
Priority number, dateUS20090178332P14.05.2009         Original published format: US 178332 P
US20090178338P14.05.2009         Original published format: US 178338 P
US20090178452P14.05.2009         Original published format: US 178452 P
US2010077538006.05.2010         Original published format: US 775380
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010132293
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2430861
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2430861
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, // H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W88/06
[2014/08]
Former International [2012/12]H04W52/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNGSZUWEISUNG UNTER MEHREREN LUFTSCHNITTSTELLEN[2012/12]
English:ALLOCATING TRANSMIT POWER AMONG MULTIPLE AIR INTERFACES[2012/12]
French:ALLOCATION DE PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION PARMI DE MULTIPLES INTERFACES RADIO[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2011National basic fee paid 
14.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
26.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2014Fee for grant paid
05.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2013
Opposition(s)17.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.11.2013Request for further processing filed
07.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.11.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2010
AL16.07.2014
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU07.05.2010
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2017/38]HU07.05.2010
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2017/03]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2016/32]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2016/06]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2008253351  (PERNU VILLE [FI] ET AL) [X] 1-3,20-22,31-33,35 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0085] - [0103] * * figures 9a-12 * [A] 4-19,23-30,34;
 [A]US2004041538  (SKLOVSKY VLADIMIR [US]) [A] 1-35 * paragraphs [0032] - [0042] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2008259833  (OZTURK OZCAN [US] ET AL) [A] 4-19,23-30,34 * paragraph [0070] * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US2005003848  (CHEN TAO [US] ET AL CHEN TAO [US] ET AL) [A] 4-19,23-30,34 * paragraphs [0108] , [0109] *