Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2429542

EP2429542 - PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC DIARRHOEA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2012/12]
Inventor(s)01 / NUTTEN, Sophie
Av. de l'Avant Poste 3
CH-Lausanne 1005 / CH
02 / MERCENIER, Annick
Ch. de Rente 10
CH-1030 Bussigny / CH
03 / DUNCKER, Swantje
Avenue de Bethusy 84
CH-1012 Lausanne / CH
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2013/21]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2012/12]Marquardt, Ulf
Nestec S.A.
IP Department
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date10718590.207.05.2010
WO2010EP56292
Priority number, dateEP2009015993211.05.2009         Original published format: EP 09159932
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010130661
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2429542
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/74, A23L1/30, A61P37/08, A61P1/12
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
TitleGerman:PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG VON ALLERGISCHEM DURCHFALL[2012/12]
English:PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC DIARRHOEA[2012/12]
French:PRÉVENTION ET TRAITEMENT D'UNE DIARRHÉE ALLERGIQUE[2012/12]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase12.12.2011National basic fee paid 
12.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
22.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination26.11.2013Appeal received No.  T0318/14
31.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2008153377  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 21 - line 27 * * page 2, lines 4,5 * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 5, line 24 - line 31 * * page 18, line 8 - line 23 * * page 20, line 9 * * table 1 * * example 2 *;
 [Y]  - THIBAULT H ET AL, "EFFECTS OF LONG-TERM CONSUMPTION OF A FERMENTED INFANT FORMULA (WITH BIFIDOBACTERIUM BREVE C50 AND STREPTOCOCCUS THERMOPHILUS 065) ON ACUTE DIARRHEA IN HEALTHY INFANTS", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC GASTROENTEROLOGY AND NUTRITION, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040801), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0277-2116, pages 147 - 152, XP009043383 [Y] 1-9 * page 147, column 2 * * page 150, column 4 * * page 151, columns 4,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005176-200408000-00004
 [Y]  - YASUI H. ET AL, "Immunomodulatory function of lactic acid bacteria", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1999), vol. 76, pages 383 - 389, XP002538609 [Y] 1-9 * page 383, columns 3,4 * * page 384, column 3 * * page 386, columns 1,2,3 * * page 388, columns 2,3,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1002041616085
 [Y]  - HE F ET AL, "Comparison of mucosal adhesion and species identification of bifidobacteria isolated from healthy and allergic infants", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 30, pages 43 - 47, XP002538610 [Y] 1-9 * page 43, column 2 * * page 45, columns 2,3 * * page 46, column 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-695X.2001.tb01548.x
 [A]  - MARTEAU P R, "PROBIOTICS IN CLINICAL CONDITIONS", CLINICAL REVIEWS IN ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, TOTOWA, NJ, US, (20020101), vol. 22, no. 3, ISSN 1080-0549, pages 255 - 273, XP009027205 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/CRIAI:22:3:255
by applicant   - SAAVEDRA ET AL., THE LANCET, (1994), vol. 344, page 1046
    - THIBAULT ET AL., J PED GASTRO NUTR, (2004), vol. 39, page 147
    - RONA, R.J. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 120, pages 638 - 646
    - BRANDT B.B ET AL., JCI, (2003), vol. 112, no. 11, pages 1666 - 1667
    - SALMINEN S; OUWEHAND A.; BENNO Y. ET AL., "Probiotics: how should they be defined", TRENDS FOOD SCI. TECHNOL., (1939), vol. 10, pages 107 - 10, XP055150446
    - GLENN R. GIBSON; MARCEL B, "Roberfroid, Dietary Modulation of the Human Colonic Microbiota: Introducing the Concept of Prebiotics", J. NUTR., (1995), vol. 125, pages 1401 - 1412