Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2424384

EP2424384 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DIGESTIVE COAGULATION OF PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
28.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
[2012/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Ludwig, Thomas
Bosrandweg 20
NL-6704 PH Wageningen / NL
02 / van den Braak, Claudia Catharina Maria
Bosrandweg 20
NL-6704 PH Wageningen / NL
03 / Klebach, Marianne
Bosrandweg 20
NL-6704 PH Wageningen / NL
04 / Hofman, Zandrie
Bosrandweg 20
NL-6704 PH Wageningen / NL
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2012/10]de Boer, Henricus J.R.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J. W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date10718726.227.04.2010
WO2010NL50241
Priority number, dateWO2009NL5022727.04.2009         Original published format: PCT/NL2009/050227
[2012/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010131952
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2424384
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2424384
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/29, A23L1/305, A61K38/16
[2012/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG DER KOAGULATION VON PROTEINEN WÄHREND DER VERDAUUNG[2012/10]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DIGESTIVE COAGULATION OF PROTEINS[2012/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LA COAGULATION DIGESTIVE DES PROTÉINES[2012/10]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2011National basic fee paid 
26.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
24.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2013Fee for grant paid
28.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13166451.8  / EP2622971
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  08.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  14.05.2014  20.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/34]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  08.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  14.05.2014  20.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  08.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  14.05.2014  20.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
Former [2016/22]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  08.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Kingsbury, Oliver William
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  14.05.2014  20.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Stasse 1
61352 Bad-Homburg v.d.H. / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
Former [2014/25]
Opponent(s)01  06.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Laboratories
100 Abbott Park Rd.
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant, et al
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  08.05.2014  13.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Kingsbury, Oliver William
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
GB-Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  14.05.2014   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
25.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0857/16
27.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0857/16
27.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0857/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
31.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0857/16
13.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.04.2010
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MK14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU27.04.2010
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU27.04.2010
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2016/28]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2016/22]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
SM14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2016/16]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE27.04.2014
LU27.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
LU27.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
IT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/14]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/12]AT14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/11]AT14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/10]AT14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO14.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[XD]EP1972346  (KATRY INVERSIONES S L [ES]) [XD] 1-15 * paragraph [0006]; example -; claim - *;
 [ID]US2003104033  (LAI CHON-SI [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [I]WO02098242  (NESTEC SA [CH]) [I] 1-15 * example -; claim - *