Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2424384


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.09.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.07.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
16.11.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
11.11.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
28.06.2016 New entry: Appeal number
28.06.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.06.2016 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.06.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
28.06.2016 Deletion: Appeal number
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
25.04.2016 New entry: Appeal number
25.04.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.04.2016 Change: Appeal number
12.04.2016 New entry: Appeal number
12.04.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
06.04.2016 New entry: Appeal number
06.04.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
14.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
14.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
24.01.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
21.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
24.10.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
25.06.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
16.05.2014 Opposition filed published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
25.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
10.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
12.07.2013 (Expected) grant published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
05.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.06.2013 Change - representative published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
10.05.2013 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
16.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.12.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.08.2012 First examination report
13.07.2012 Change - extension states published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
11.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
03.02.2012 Request for examination filed published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
30.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
14.11.2011 Amendment by applicant
01.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication