EP2569239 - METHOD FOR STORING A FLEXIBLE TUBE OR A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/12] | METHOD FOR STORING A FLEXIBLE TUBE OR A CABLE | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RETZLAFF, Jan Hauptstrasse 133 71364 Winnenden / DE | 02 /
JEUTTER, Timo Falkenstrasse 16 73663 Berglen / DE | 03 /
HAUG, Oliver Sirnauerstrasse 29 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10719532.3 | 10.05.2010 | WO2010EP56384 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141050 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569239 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569239 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/40, B65H75/22, B65H75/44 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
B65H75/403 (EP);
B65H75/4465 (EP);
B65H2701/33 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | B65H75/40, B65H75/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEVORRATUNG EINES SCHLAUCHES ODER EINES KABELS | [2014/44] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING A FLEXIBLE TUBE OR A CABLE | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RANGEMENT D'UN TUYAU OU D'UN CÂBLE | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/12] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEVORRATUNG EINES SCHLAUCHES ODER EINES KABELS | ||
Former [2013/12] | METHOD FOR STORING A FLEXIBLE TUBE OR A CABLE | ||
Former [2013/12] | DISPOSITIF DE RANGEMENT D'UN TUYAU OU D'UN CÂBLE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2010 | AL | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | AT | 10.05.2015 | IE | 10.05.2015 | LU | 10.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.05.2010 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MK | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
AT | 10.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.05.2010 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
AT | 10.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
AT | 10.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
AT | 10.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
IE | 10.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 10.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2060526 (WILHELM HEPPERLE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-18,20,21,23,25,26,29,32 * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] - [0048]; figures 1,2 * [I] 4,5,19,31; | [X]DE9013713U (WOELKE, ERHARD) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11,19,20,29 * the whole document *; | [XI]FR2894236 (MERMIER LEMARCHAND SOC PAR ACT [FR]) [X] 1-6,9,11,12,17,19,20,29,30 * the whole document * [I] 31 | by applicant | US2004084084 | EP2060526 | DE9013713U | FR2894236 |