Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2425057

EP2425057 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FURNISH, FURNISH AND PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UPM-Kymmene Corporation
Alvar Aallon katu 1
00100 Helsinki / FI
[2014/41]
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
UPM-Kymmene Corporation
Eteläesplanadi 2
00130 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LAINE, Janne
Vanha Kirkkotie 22 A
FI-02300 Espoo / FI
02 / ÖSTERBERG, Monika
Kultarinnantie 1
FI-02660 Espoo / FI
03 / MIQUEL, Delphine
12 rue des Chövremonts
FR-92150 Suresnses / FR
04 / POHJOLA, Leila
Järventaustanpolku 10
FI-03220 Tervalampi / FI
05 / SINISALO, Irmeli
Untamonkatu 17 B 2
FI-53100 Lappeenranta / FI
06 / KOSONEN, Harri
Kontiaisenkatu 13
FI-53300 Lappeenranta / FI
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/10]Pursiainen, Timo Pekka , et al
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date10719950.729.04.2010
WO2010FI50350
Priority number, dateFI2009000548029.04.2009         Original published format: FI 20095480
[2012/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010125247
Date:04.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2425057
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2425057
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:D21H17/67, D21H11/18
[2012/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PAPIERSTOFFS, PAPIERSTOFF UND PAPIER[2012/10]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING FURNISH, FURNISH AND PAPER[2012/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITION DE FABRICATION, COMPOSITION DE FABRICATION ET PAPIER[2012/10]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2011National basic fee paid 
27.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
17.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
23.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2013Observations by third parties
27.03.2013Fee for grant paid
27.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13162757.2  / EP2615207
EP13162759.8  / EP2615208
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  24.02.2015  WITHDRAWN
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Russell, Tim
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 [2019/34]
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  24.02.2015  WITHDRAWN
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
EDP Patent Attorneys B.V.
Bronland 12-E
NL-6708 WH Wageningen / NL
Former [2016/24]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  24.02.2015  WITHDRAWN
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2015/33]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  24.02.2015  WITHDRAWN
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  24.02.2015  WITHDRAWN
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2014/47]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014  19.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 04  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014  25.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2014/22]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014   
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
 02  17.04.2014   
Aechter, Bernd
Mauerkircherstr. 45
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  17.04.2014   
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 04  17.04.2014   
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Nikolopoulou, Sofia
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 05  17.04.2014   
Imerys Minerals Limited
Par Moor Centre, Par Moor Road
Par, Cornwall PL 24 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  16.04.2014   
BillerudKorsnäs AB
Box 703
16927 Solna / SE
Opponent's representative
Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
22.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.08.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2114/16
14.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2114/16
13.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2114/16
05.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2114/16
05.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:24.08.2012Request for further processing filed
24.08.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.09.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.04.2010
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MK17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
SM17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU29.04.2010
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
SM17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU29.04.2010
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
SM17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/28]BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
SM17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/22]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
SM17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/16]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/21]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE29.04.2014
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU29.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU29.04.2014
Former [2014/52]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/24]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/21]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
DK17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/14]BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/07]NO17.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1936032  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1,8-13 * paragraph [0030]; example 1; claims 1-18 *;
 [X]WO0047628  (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1,12,13 * claims 134-143 *;
 [XP]WO2009153225  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,8,12,13 * page 10, lines 33-36 * * page 12, lines 1-2 *;
 [A]US2001004869  (CANTIANI ROBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0129308  (CARGILL INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6183596  (MATSUDA YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicant   - KUTHCARLAPATI ET AL., METALS MATERIALS AND PROCESSES, (2008), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 307 - 314
    - PAAKKO ET AL., "Enzymatic hydrolysis combined with mechanical shearing and high pressure homogenization for nanoscale cellulose fibrils and strong gels", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2007), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1021/BM061215P, pages 1934 - 1941, XP003026928

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM061215P
other   - AHOLA S. ET AL, "Cellulose nanofibrilsâ adsorption with poly(amideamine) epichlorohydrin studied by QCM-D and application as a paper strength additive", CELLULOSE, (20070920), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 303 - 314, XP019570956
    - HUBBE M.A. ET AL, "Cellulosic Nanocomposites: A Review", BIORESOURCES, (20080801), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 929 - 980, XP008153716