Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2421549

EP2421549 - SILK FIBROIN HYDROGELS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92613 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALTMAN, Gregory, H.
101 Madison Avenue
Arlington MA 02474 / US
02 / HORAN, Rebeca, L.
12 Rockaway Lane
Arlington MA 02474 / US
03 / COLLETTE, Adam, L.
937 Genera Beauregard Drive
Virginia Beach VA 23454 / US
04 / CHEN, Jing Song
937 General Beauregard Drive
Virgina Beach VA 23454 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/09]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10720211.120.04.2010
WO2010US31819
Priority number, dateUS20090170895P20.04.2009         Original published format: US 170895 P
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010123947
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2421549
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2421549
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61L27/52, A61L27/22, A61K38/01
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SEIDEN-FIBROIN-HYDROGELE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN[2012/09]
English:SILK FIBROIN HYDROGELS AND USES THEREOF[2012/09]
French:HYDROGELS À BASE DE FIBROÏNES DE SOIE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2011National basic fee paid 
04.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
06.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.01.2013Fee for grant paid
07.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2014  17.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Tufts University
Ballou Hall
Medford MA 02155 / US
Opponent's representative
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP, et al
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
 [2019/34]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2014  17.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Tufts University
Ballou Hall
Medford MA 02155 / US
Opponent's representative
Brown, David Leslie, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
16.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1740/16
21.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.03.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2017/14]
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.04.2010
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MK12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2017/11]HU20.04.2010
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/33]HU20.04.2010
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT20.04.2015
Former [2016/32]HU20.04.2010
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT20.04.2015
Former [2016/31]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT20.04.2015
Former [2016/22]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
SM12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT20.04.2015
Former [2016/21]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
IT20.04.2015
Former [2016/16]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE20.04.2014
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
LU20.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
LU20.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
DK12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
NL12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO03022909  (CONSORZIO PER GLI STUDI UNI [IT]; MIGLIARESI CLAUDIO [IT]; KESENCI KEM) [A] 1-28 * examples 1-4; claims 1, 9 *
 [Y]  - GIL E S ET AL, "Effect of [beta]-sheet crystals on the thermal and rheological behavior of protein-based hydrogels derived from gelatin and silk fibroin", MACROMOLECULAR BIOSCIENCE 20050812 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE, (20050812), vol. 5, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1002/MABI.200500076, pages 702 - 709, XP002603674 [Y] 1-28 * p. 703, Preparation of SF Solutions * * p. 703, Preparation of Blends and Films *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MABI.200500076
 [Y]  - GIL E S ET AL, "Swelling behavior and morphological evolution of mixed gelatin/silk fibroin hydrogels", BIOMACROMOLECULES NOVEMBER/DECEMBER 2005 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY US, (200511), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1021/BM050396C, pages 3079 - 3087, XP002603675 [Y] 1-28 * p. 3080, Methods. 1. Preparation *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM050396C
 [Y]  - SOFIA S ET AL, "Functionalized silk-based biomaterials for bone formation", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/1097-4636(200101)54:1<,139::AID-JBM17>,3.0.CO,2-7, (20010101), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 139 - 148, XP002400267 [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 140, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 141, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4636(200101)54:1<139::AID-JBM17>3.0.CO;2-7
 [YD]  - HERSEL U ET AL, "RGD modified polymers: biomaterials for stimulated cell adhesion and beyond", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00343-0, (20031101), vol. 24, no. 24, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 4385 - 4415, XP004446082 [YD] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(03)00343-0
 [Y]  - BELOUSOVA NATALYA ET AL, "Modulation of adenovirus vector tropism via incorporation of polypeptide ligands into the fiber protein", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200209), vol. 76, no. 17, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8621 - 8631, XP002603676 [Y] 1-28 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.17.8621-8631.2002
by applicant   - HUNTER ET AL., SOFT TISSUE IMPLANTS AND ANTI-SCARRING AGENTS
    - MERRIFIELD B, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 5, pages 1947 - 1951
    - "The chemical synthesis of proteins", MUTTER M, INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, (197903), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 274 - 7
Opposition   - Transactions of the 32nd Annual Meeting of the Society for Biomaterials, Chicago, Illinois, USA, (20070418), XP055264548
    - ALTMAN et al., "Silk matrix for tissue engineered anterior cruciate ligaments", Biomaterials, (20020000), vol. 23, pages 4131 - 4141, XP004370404

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(02)00156-4
    - JIN et al., "Mechanism of silk processing in insects and spiders", Letters to Nature, (20030000), vol. 424, pages 1057 - 1061, XP055058447

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01809
    - the procedure to confirm the technical necessity that silk fibroin must be sericin depleted for biocompatibility .
    - the procedure to confirm that silk fibroin is amphiphilic and that this was known prior to the Patent .