Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2435872

EP2435872 - PORT MAPPING FOR SERIES CONNECTED FIBER OPTIC TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Cable Systems LLC
800 17th Street NW
Hickory NC 28601 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
Corning Cable Systems LLC
800 17th Street NW
Hickory NC 28602 / US
Former [2012/14]For all designated states
Corning Cable Systems LLC
Intellectual Property Department SP-TI-3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONNER, Mark E.
5378 Benjamin's Place
Granite Falls North Carolina 28630 / US
02 / STRAUSE, Kevin L.
1000 Valle Vista Lane
Keller Texas 76248 / US
 [2012/14]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Sturm, Christoph
Quermann Sturm Weilnau
Patentanwälte
Unter den Eichen 7
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2012/14]Sturm, Christoph
Quermann Sturm Weilnau
Patentanwälte
Unter den Eichen 7
D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date10720238.424.05.2010
WO2010US35939
Priority number, dateUS2009047284927.05.2009         Original published format: US 472849
[2012/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010138446
Date:02.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2435872
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010
[2012/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2435872
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2013/17]
Former International [2012/14]G02B6/44, H04B10/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PORTABBILDUNG FÜR IN REIHE GESCHALTETE FASEROPTISCHE TERMINALS[2012/14]
English:PORT MAPPING FOR SERIES CONNECTED FIBER OPTIC TERMINALS[2012/14]
French:MAPPAGE DE PORTS POUR TERMINAUX À FIBRE OPTIQUE CONNECTÉS EN SÉRIE[2012/14]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2011National basic fee paid 
04.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
25.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.08.2013Fee for grant paid
09.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2012
Opposition(s)31.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.05.2010
AL30.10.2013
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU24.05.2010
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/33]HU24.05.2010
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU24.05.2010
AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/22]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/14]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU24.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
LU24.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/38]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
IT30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/25]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT30.10.2013
BE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Cited inInternational search[XP]US2010092129  (CONNER MARK E [US]) [XP] 25 * paragraphs [0055] - [0057]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XI]WO03016975  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-12,17-23 * abstract * * page 12, lines 15-24 * [I] 14-16,24;
 [X]US2008175548  (KNECHT DENNIS MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US6464404  (ROBINSON MATTHEW SCOTT [US] ET AL) [I] 1-12,14-24 * abstract * * column 3, lines 33-45 *