Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2441317

EP2441317 - LIQUID-COOLED COOLING APPARATUS, ELECTRONICS RACK AND METHODS OF FABRICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LENOVO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD.
151 Lorong Chuan
Suite 02-01 New Tech Park
Singapore 556741 / SG
[2017/25]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
LENOVO ENTERPRISE SOLUTIONS (SINGAPORE) PTE. LTD.
151 Lorong Chuan
Suite 02-01 New Tech Park
Singapore 556741 / SG
Former [2012/16]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Former [N/P]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SIMONS, Robert
IBM Corporation
MD LL-15
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Levi
IBM Corporation
MD P520
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US
03 / CHU, Richard
IBM Corporation
MD P520
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US
04 / IYENGAR, Madhusudan
IBM Corporation
MD P520
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US
05 / ELLSWORTH, Jr, Michael
IBM Corporation
MD P520
2455 South Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Schweiger, Martin , et al
Schweiger & Partners
Intellectual Property Law Firm
Elsenheimer Strasse 1
80687 München / DE
[2017/25]
Former [2012/16]Williams, Julian David
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Mailpoint 110 Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date10720295.411.05.2010
[2017/25]
WO2010EP56452
Priority number, dateUS2009048182410.06.2009         Original published format: US 481824
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010142505
Date:16.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2441317
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010
[2012/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2441317
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20
[2012/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTE KÜHLVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPENTRÄGER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2012/16]
English:LIQUID-COOLED COOLING APPARATUS, ELECTRONICS RACK AND METHODS OF FABRICATION THEREOF[2012/16]
French:APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT REFROIDI PAR LIQUIDE, BAIE DE MATÉRIEL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2011National basic fee paid 
15.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
20.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.05.2017Fee for grant paid
02.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2016
Opposition(s)22.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/39]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP0316129  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9,17 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3,5-8,10-13,15,16,18-20;
 [I]US7312987  (KONSHAK MICHAEL V [US]) [I] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * column 3, lines 12-32; figure 1; claims 1,4,6,8 *;
 [XI]US2007297136  (KONSHAK MICHAEL V [US]) [X] 17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0036] - [0058]; figures 4-9 * [I] 1-5,8,9,12-15,20;
 [A]US2005068728  (CHU RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025]; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US7450385  (CAMPBELL LEVI A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 18 - column 11, line 18; figures 3-11 *
by applicantEP0316129
 US7312987
 US2007297136
 US2005068728
 US7450385