Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2421887

EP2421887 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF DEGARELIX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Polypeptide Laboratories A/S
Herredsvejen 2
3400 Hilleröd / DK
[2012/09]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Haixiang
7 Rue de Boulogne
F-67100 Strasbourg / FR
02 / FOMSGAARD, Jens
Vinkelvej 27
DK-3520 Farum / DK
03 / STAERKAER, Gunnar
J.M. Thielesvej 3A, 5 Th.
DK-1961 Fredriksberg C / DK
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Schöneborn, Holger
Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Huestraße 23
(Kortumkarree)
44787 Bochum / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]Schöneborn, Holger
Schneiders & Behrendt
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Huestraße 23
(Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2012/09]Schöneborn, Holger
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23
44787 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date10720343.226.04.2010
WO2010EP02550
Priority number, dateSE2009000055824.04.2009         Original published format: SE 0900558
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010121835
Date:28.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2421887
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010
[2012/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2421887
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/23
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DEGARELIX[2012/09]
English:METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF DEGARELIX[2012/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DU DEGARELIX[2012/09]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2011National basic fee paid 
24.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
22.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2015Fee for grant paid
10.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2016   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 [2016/09]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition08.09.2017Appeal received No.  T1971/17
10.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
LU26.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2018/02]AT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
LU26.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2017/38]AT22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2017/03]AT22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US5925730  (SEMPLE GRAEME [GB], et al) [XD] 9-12 * abstract * * example 1 * [I] 1-8;
 [AD]  - KANETI J ET AL, "Thorpe-Ingold effects in cyclizations to five-membered and six-membered rings containing planar segments. The rearrangement of N(1)-alkyl-substituted dihydroorotic acids to hydantoinacetic acids in base", ORGANIC AND BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY 20040407 ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY GB, (20040407), vol. 2, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1039/B400248B, pages 1098 - 1103, XP002596391 [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1099, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b400248b
 [A]  - CESCATO RENZO ET AL, "Design and in vitro characterization of highly sst2-selective somatostatin antagonists suitable for radiotargeting.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 10 JUL 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18543899, (20080710), vol. 51, no. 13, ISSN 1520-4804, pages 4030 - 4037, XP002596392 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 4034, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm701618q
by applicant   - KOEDJIKOV, A. H., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN, TRANS., (1984), vol. 2, pages 1077 - 1081
    - KANETI, J., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2004), pages 1098 - 1103
OppositionWO9846634
    - M. AMBLARD et al., "Methods and Protocols of Modern Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis", Molecular Biotechnology, (20060000), vol. 33, pages 239 - 254, XP009116689

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:33:3:239
    - G. A. GRANT, Synthetic peptides. A user's guide, (20020000), XP008168434
    - J. JONES, Amino acid and peptide synthesis, (20020000), pages 68 - 80, XP055267747
    - G. B. FIELDS et al., "Methods for removing the Fmoc group", Peptide Synthesis Protocols, (19940000), vol. 35, pages 17 - 27, XP055267757
    - Fmoc Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis, (20071104), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/200711 040847421, XP055267759