Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2563894

EP2563894 - DELIVERY PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DIHORA, Jiten, Odhavji
4521 Randall Drive
Hamilton Ohio 45011 / US
02 / SMETS, Johan
Bollenberg 79
B-3210 Lubbeek / BE
03 / SCHWANTES, Todd, Arlin
5057 Machickanee Lane
Lena Wisconsin 54139 / US
 [2013/10]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Belgium UK
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Vercruysse, Nicolas , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date10721567.512.05.2010
WO2010IB52121
Priority number, dateUS20100328962P28.04.2010         Original published format: US 328962 P
[2013/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010079467
Date:15.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2563894
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/50, C11D17/00, A61K8/11, A61Q19/10, B01J13/18
[2013/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/10]
TitleGerman:FREISETZUNGSPARTIKEL[2013/10]
English:DELIVERY PARTICLES[2013/10]
French:PARTICULE D'ADMINISTRATION[2013/10]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2012National basic fee paid 
25.10.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2012Examination requested  [2013/10]
26.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.08.2017Appeal received No.  T2522/17
11.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP13188005.6  / EP2687590
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
06.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009274905  (SCHWANTES TODD ARLIN [US]) [X] 1-11,15-18,23-25 * paragraphs [0008] , [0015]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-25;
 [XI]WO2006127454  (APPLETON PAPER INC [US]) [X] 1,4,11,15,16,18,23-25 * pages 4-6, paragraph 59; examples 8,10,11; claim - * [I] 1,4,11,15,16,18,23-25
by applicant   - HUBER, "Capsular Adhesives", TAPPI, (196605), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 41A - 44A
    - ZHANG, Z.; SUN, G, "Mechanical Properties of Melamine-Formaldehyde microcapsules", J. MICROENCAPSULATION, (2001), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 593 - 602, XP008139505