Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2410845

EP2410845 - Compositions comprising azamethiphos and either cypermethrin or deltamethrin to combat ectoparasites in fish [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/05]COMPOSITIONS TO COMBAT ECTOPARASITES
[2014/09]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NO
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nettforsk AS
P.O. Box 52
4801 Arendal / NO
[2014/13]
Former [2012/05]For all designated states
Nettforsk AS
P.O. Box 52
4801 Norway / NO
Inventor(s)01 / JOHANNESSEN, Baard
Nettforsk AS
P.O. Box 52
N-4801 Arendal / NO
 [2012/05]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/08]Hoffmann, Benjamin
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2012/05]Hoffmann, Benjamin
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date10722387.725.03.2010
WO2010GB00569
Priority number, dateGB2009000516525.03.2009         Original published format: GB 0905165
[2012/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010109198
Date:30.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2410845
Date:01.02.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2410845
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01N57/16, A01N53/00, A01P7/00
[2014/09]
Former International [2012/05]A01N37/44, A01N53/00, A01N57/14, A01N57/16, A01P7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen enthaltend azamethiphos und entweder Cypermethrin oder Deltamethrin zur Bekämpfung von Ektoparasiten auf Fisch[2014/09]
English:Compositions comprising azamethiphos and either cypermethrin or deltamethrin to combat ectoparasites in fish[2014/09]
French:Compositions comprenant azaméthiphos et soit cyperméthrine soit deltaméthrine pour la lutte contre les ectoparasites des poissons[2014/34]
Former [2012/05]ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE BEKÄMPFUNG VON EKTOPARASITEN
Former [2012/05]COMPOSITIONS TO COMBAT ECTOPARASITES
Former [2012/05]COMPOSITIONS ANTI-ECTOPARASITAIRES
Entry into regional phase18.10.2011National basic fee paid 
18.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/05]
03.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2014Fee for grant paid
22.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.11.2015  19.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FVG Limited
22 Carsegate Road
Inverness
IV3 8EX / GB
Opponent's representative
Mitchell, Simon James, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/01]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2015  19.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FVG Limited
22 Carsegate Road
Inverness
IV3 8EX / GB
Opponent's representative
Mitchell, Simon James, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Former [2016/40]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2015  19.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FVG Limited
22 Carsegate Road
Inverness
IV3 8EX / GB
Opponent's representative
Green, Mark Charles, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Former [2015/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.11.2015  19.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
FVG Limited
22 Carsegate Road
Inverness
IV3 8EX / GB
Opponent's representative
Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
05.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition28.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2183/17
30.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.07.2013Request for further processing filed
25.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.08.2013Decision despatched
03.09.2012Request for further processing filed
03.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
MT25.03.2017
PL25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
BG06.10.2017
NO31.03.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/11]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
MT25.03.2017
PL25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
BG06.10.2017
Former [2018/50]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
MT25.03.2017
PL25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/43]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
MT25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/38]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
ES26.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/30]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
MK18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/24]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/21]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
DK31.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/12]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
SI26.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/11]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
IT25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
GR05.10.2017
Former [2018/10]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
HR25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
DE03.10.2017
Former [2018/09]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
EE31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
Former [2018/08]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
NL01.04.2017
PT25.09.2017
Former [2018/07]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
LT25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
PT25.09.2017
Former [2018/01]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
LU25.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
PT25.09.2017
Former [2017/50]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
LV25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
SE26.03.2017
Former [2017/49]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
CY25.03.2017
FI25.03.2017
RO25.03.2017
Former [2017/38]HU25.03.2010
AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
SM18.02.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
Former [2016/23]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB18.05.2015
Former [2016/06]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/01]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
MC18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
Former [2015/49]AT18.02.2015
CZ18.02.2015
SK18.02.2015
Former [2015/38]AT18.02.2015
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2793112  (PHARMYGIENE SCAT LAB [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 11 - line 15 * * claim 7 *;
 [I]WO2009010755  (NETTFORSK AS [NO], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 2 - line 9 * * page 5, line 2 - line 38 * * claims 1-7 *;
 [Y]  - SCHERING-PLOUGH ANIMAL HEALTH, "Sea Lice, Technical Monograph, SLICE", INTERNET CITATION, (20021231), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.spaquaculture.com/assets/3-28sealcfinal.pdf, (20091203), XP002558899 [Y] 1-10 * Bath treatments for use in seal lice control; page 16 *
 [Y]  - GRANT ANDREW N, "Medicines for sea lice", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (20020507), vol. 58, doi:10.1002/ps.481, ISSN 1526-498X, pages 521 - 527, XP002592569 [Y] 1-10 * Paragraphs 3.1, 3.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PS.481
 [X]  - AHMAD M; SALEEM M A; SAYYED A H, "Efficacy of insecticide mixtures against pyrethroid- and organophosphate-resistant populations of Spodoptera litura (Lepidoptera: Noctuidae)", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (20081202), vol. 65, doi:10.1002/ps.1681, pages 266 - 274, XP007915228 [X] 11-14 * paragraph 1 (Introduction) * * paragraph 3.2 (The toxicity of insecticides alone and in combination) * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.1681
 [X]  - AHMAD M, "Observed potentiation between pyrethroid and organophosphorus insecticides for the management of Spodoptera litura (Lepidoptera: Noctuidae)", CROP PROTECTION, (20081213), vol. 28, doi:10.1016/j.cropro.2008.11.001, ISSN 0261-2194, pages 264 - 268, XP025927811 [X] 11-14 * tables 1-4 * * paragraph 3 (Results and discussion) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cropro.2008.11.001
by applicantWO2009010755