Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2442779

EP2442779 - ANTIPERSPIRANT USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/45]For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2012/17]For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / COURTOIS, Jean-Philippe, Andre, Roger
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
02 / HARDING, Clive, Roderick
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
03 / HARKER, Mark
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
04 / KELSO, Hailey
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
05 / WEDDELL, Iain, Andrew
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
 [2012/17]
Representative(s)Whaley, Christopher
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Whaley, Christopher
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date10723075.720.05.2010
WO2010EP56985
Priority number, dateEP2009016277816.06.2009         Original published format: EP 09162778
[2012/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010145909
Date:23.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2442779
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010
[2012/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2442779
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02, A61K8/06, A61K8/97, A61Q15/00
[2012/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHWEISSHEMMERVERWENDUNG[2012/43]
English:ANTIPERSPIRANT USAGE[2012/17]
French:Utilisation anti-transpirante[2012/43]
Former [2012/17]VERWENDUNG EINES ANTIPERSPIRANTS
Former [2012/17]UTILISATION D'UN ANTITRANSPIRANT
Entry into regional phase20.10.2011National basic fee paid 
20.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/17]
02.11.2012Observations by third parties
26.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2013Fee for grant paid
23.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.08.2014  11.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  06.08.2014  13.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wihstutz, Kolja, et al
Beiersdorf AG
Brieffach 79
Unnastraße 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2014/38]
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  06.08.2014   
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David, et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
16.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition01.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0803/16
15.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.05.2010
AL06.11.2013
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
TR06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU20.05.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
TR06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/33]HU20.05.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
TR06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU20.05.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/31]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/22]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/14]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/38]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006110753  (COTY SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0047182  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009063016  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10057767  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2007071474
by applicantWO0152805
 EP0545556
    - J.REGOS ET AL., DERMATOLOGICA, (1979), vol. 158, pages 72 - 79
    - K. SAWANO; T. SATO; R. HATTORI, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1 YTH IFSCC INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (1992), pages 210 - 232
otherWO2007071474
OppositionWO2007071474
 US5593663
 WO2009063016
    - "Antiperspirants", André O. Barel, Marc Paye, Howard I. Maibach, Handbook of Cosmetic Science and Technology, Third edition, Informa Healthcare, (20090300), vol. 62, pages 631 - 641, ISBN 9781420069631, XP055266970

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/b15273-63
    - ROLF DANIELS, "DermoTopics", Novel Gel Systems;, (20011000), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.dermotopics.de/english/issue_2_02_e/daniels_novelgels_2_02_e.htm, XP055266975
    - BRINON L; ET AL, "Influence of lamellar liquid crystal structure on Jan/Feb. 1998 A 54(2) percutaneous diffusion of a hydrophilic tracer;", J. Cosmet. Sci., (19980100), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 1 - 11, XP000982684
    - Skin Care Forum, (19931200), pages 1 - 8, XP055267012