blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2417576 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2417576



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 564
13.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
02.06.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
28.11.2016 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.11.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
16.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
10.09.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
31.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
26.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.06.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.06.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
27.04.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
02.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.03.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.02.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
15.02.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.08.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.07.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.07.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.06.2015 Claims Appeal 3
23.06.2015 Claims Appeal 3
23.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.06.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
13.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.04.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.02.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
16.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
11.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
23.01.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
20.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
12.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
16.08.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
11.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
04.08.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
05.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.09.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 27
02.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 114
03.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.05.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2012 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.01.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
29.11.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.11.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 General authorisation Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
19.08.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.11.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
14.10.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.10.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.10.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
11.06.2010 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
27.05.2010 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
08.04.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.04.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.04.2010 Description International Searching Authority 19
08.04.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 4