Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2393943

EP2393943 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2015
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Whitespace Enterprise Corporation
15818 Palomino Blvd.
Fountain Hills, AZ 85268 / US
[2015/36]
Former [2013/28]For all designated states
BioAccel
445 N. 5th Street, Suite 120
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Forensic Science Service Ltd
Trident Court 2920 Solihull Parkway Birmingham Business Park
Birmingham, B37 7YN / GB
For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents acting for and on behalf of Arizona State University
1475 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 200
Scottsdale, AZ / US
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Forensic Science Service Ltd
Trident Court 2920 Solihull Parkway Birmingham Business Park
Birmingham, B37 7YN / GB
For all designated states
Zenhausern, Frederic
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
For all designated states
Nordquist, Alan
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
For all designated states
Lenigk, Ralf
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
For all designated states
Hurth, Cedric
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
For all designated states
Yang, Jianing
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
For all designated states
CHEN, Xiaojia
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Forensic Science Service Ltd
Trident Court 2920 Solihull Parkway Birmingham Business Park
Birmingham, B37 7YN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ZENHAUSERN, Frederic
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
02 / NORDQUIST, Alan
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
03 / LENIGK, Ralf
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
04 / HURTH, Cedric
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
05 / YANG, Jianing
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
06 / CHEN, Xiaojia
425 N. 5th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US
07 / LEE-EDGEHILL, John
Trident Court
2920 Solihull Parkway
Birmingham B37 YYN / GB
08 / MORAN, Nina
Trident Court
2920 Solihull Parkway
Birmingham B37 YYN / GB
09 / HOPWOOD, Andrew
Trident Court
2920 Solihull Parkway
Birmingham B37 YYN / GB
10 / KOUMI, Pieris
Trident Court
2920 Solihull Parkway
Birmingham B37 YYN / GB
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date10725525.909.02.2010
WO2010US23639
Priority number, dateUS20090151104P09.02.2009         Original published format: US 151104 P
US20090151111P09.02.2009         Original published format: US 151111 P
US20090151107P09.02.2009         Original published format: US 151107 P
US20090151117P09.02.2009         Original published format: US 151117 P
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010091410
Date:12.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2393943
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010
[2011/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2011/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DEM LEISTUNGSVERHALTEN[2011/50]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO PERFORMANCE[2011/50]
French:PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS OU SE RAPPORTANT À DES PERFORMANCES[2011/50]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2011National basic fee paid 
03.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
26.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2018
17.01.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination10.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1591/18
03.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.11.2015Request for further processing filed
23.11.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.04.2013Request for further processing filed
13.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.05.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
19.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201304   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2013
28.02.201405   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2014
29.02.201607   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2016
28.02.201708   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2008182301  (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-16,18-23,26-28 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0089]; figures 3-4 * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0111]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0218]; figure 26 * * paragraph [0255]; figure 36; example 2 * * paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0290]; figures 43A-45D; example 6 * [I] 8,24,25;
 [XI]US2004257906  (SCRIBA JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-16,18-20,22,23,27,28 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1-9; claims 1, 18, 28, 36-37 * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0087] * [I] 5;
 [XI]WO9910735  (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-16,18-20,22,23,27,28 * page 2, line 30 - page 8, line 28; figure 2A * * page 34, line 13 - line 20 * [I] 4,6;
 [X]US2003159999  (OAKEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-16,18-20,22,23,27,28 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0058]; figures 2-4, 16 *;
 [XI]US2004086870  (TYVOLL DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-16,18-20,22,23,27,28,30-37 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0086]; figures 7-9 * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0104]; figures 10-16 * [I] 6,7;
 [X]WO2007082480  (CAPITALBIO CORP [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-12,14,18-20,22,23,27,28 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0055]; claim 7 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0101] *;
 [XI]WO2007125468  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,15,18-20,22,23,27,28 * page 6, line 32 - page 17, line 8; figures 5, 7-9, 11 * [I] 4-6,9;
 [X]WO0078454  (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,15,18-20,22,23,27,28 * page 4, line 10 - line 30; figures 5a-5d * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 24 * * page 10, line 16 - line 33 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 31; figure 2 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 24; figure 3 * * page 16, line 11 - page 18, line 2 *;
 [X]US2005243304  (PADMANABHAN ARAVIND [US], et al) [X] 18-28 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-14a * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0092] *;
 [X]WO2009002152  (MICRONIT MICROFLUIDICS BV [NL], et al) [X] 18-28 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 5 * * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 26; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2004043479  (BRISCOE CYNTHIA G [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0235] * * paragraph [0299]; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2007047336  (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-4 * * page 16, line 7 - page 18, line 2; example 1 *;
 [X]WO2006032044  (MICROCHIP BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1; claims 1-2, 25 * * paragraphs [0140] - [0144]; figures 10, 13-15 * * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0208]; figures 1, 19-20 *;
 [X]WO2009002580  (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * paragraph [0284] - paragraph [0290] * * paragraph [0312] - paragraph [0313]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2005053952  (HONG JONG WOOK [US], et al) [X] 30-35,37 * figure 2; examples 1-2 *;
 [A]US2004115094  (GUMBRECHT WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ROBIN HUI LIU ET AL, "SELF-CONTAINED, FULLY INTEGRATED BIOCHIP FOR SAMPLE PREPARATION, POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION AMPLIFICATION, AND DNA MICROARRAY DETECTION", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/AC0353029, (20040401), vol. 76, no. 7, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1824 - 1831, XP001196720 [X] 30-34,36,37 * page 1825, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1831, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0353029
by applicantUS2008182301