Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2435189

EP2435189 - CENTRIFUGE HAVING A LUBRICANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[2012/14]
Inventor(s)01 / MACKEL, Wilfried
Heienkamp 11
59510 Lippetal / DE
02 / SEDLER, Marie-Theres
Augustin-Wibbelt-Str. 24
59329 Wadersloh / DE
03 / BATHELT, Thomas
Von-Brachum-Str. 18
59302 Oelde / DE
04 / KLEIMANN, Thomas
Hindenburgstr. 23
59302 Oelde / DE
05 / PENKL, Andreas
Im Löttenkamp 10
59510 Lippetal / DE
06 / TERWEY, Bernd
Sirksfeld 5
48653 Coesfeld / DE
 [2012/14]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2012/14]
Application number, filing date10726451.728.05.2010
WO2010EP57448
Priority number, dateDE2009102297228.05.2009         Original published format: DE102009022972
[2012/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010136579
Date:02.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2435189
Date:04.04.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010
[2012/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2435189
Date:01.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:B04B9/12, B04B9/14
[2012/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZENTRIFUGE MIT EINEM SCHMIERMITTELSYSTEM[2012/14]
English:CENTRIFUGE HAVING A LUBRICANT SYSTEM[2012/14]
French:CENTRIFUGEUR MUNI D'UN SYSTÈME DE LUBRIFICATION[2012/14]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2011National basic fee paid 
15.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
27.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2013Fee for grant paid
19.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval Corporate AB
P.B. Box 73
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Sonesson, Andreas, et al
Alfa Laval Corporate AB
Patent Department
Hans Stahles väg 7
147 80 Tumba / SE
 [2014/11]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0154/16
01.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.05.2010
AL01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
AT28.05.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2016/36]HU28.05.2010
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
AT28.05.2015
Former [2015/34]HU28.05.2010
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/32]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MK01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
SM01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/13]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
MT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2014/20]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
IE28.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/11]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/08]CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/02]CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
LV01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/52]CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI01.05.2013
HR01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT01.05.2013
NO01.08.2013
PT02.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO03080250  (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1014349  (ANSCHUETZ & CO GMBH) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1462178  (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB799484  (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0266765  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *