Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2440883

EP2440883 - INTEGRATION OF AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE OF A SENSOR INTO A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2015/31]
Former [2012/16]For all designated states
SMS Siemag Aktiengesellschaft
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FEHLEMANN, Gereon
Kreuzbergstrasse 82
40489 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Klüppel, Walter
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Klüppel, Walter
Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date10726901.108.06.2010
WO2010EP03414
Priority number, dateDE2009102451908.06.2009         Original published format: DE102009024519
DE2009104947915.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009049479
[2012/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010142410
Date:16.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2440883
Date:18.04.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010
[2012/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2440883
Date:05.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/26, G01K11/32, G01L11/02
[2012/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINBINDUNG EINES LICHTWELLENLEITERS EINES MESSSENSORS IN EIN BAUTEIL[2012/16]
English:INTEGRATION OF AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE OF A SENSOR INTO A COMPONENT[2012/16]
French:INTÉGRATION D'UN GUIDE D'ONDES OPTIQUES D'UN CAPTEUR DE MESURE DANS UN COMPOSANT[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2011National basic fee paid 
25.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
25.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2013Fee for grant paid
17.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4031 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Metals@Linz
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
 02  05.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Saveway GmbH & Co. KG
Wümbacher Str. 8
98704 Langewiesen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schober, Mirko
Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Patentanwälte
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4031 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Metals@Linz
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
 02  05.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Saveway GmbH & Co. KG
Wümbacher Str. 8
98704 Langewiesen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schober, Mirko
Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4031 Linz / AT
Opponent's representative
Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  05.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Saveway GmbH & Co. KG
Wümbacher Str. 8
98704 Langewiesen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schober, Mirko
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
11.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.08.2014Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
25.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0747/16
23.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2010
AL05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
LU08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
GB08.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU08.06.2010
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
LU08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
GB08.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
GB08.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/30]CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
GB08.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
GB08.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/37]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
FR05.08.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/21]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/20]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/18]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/16]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/14]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005061058  (WILLSCH MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * paragraph [0029]; figures 2-3 * [I] 5-12,17-22;
 [X]DD240947  (INDUCAL VEB [DD]) [X] 1,13 * figure - * * claim - * * page 3, lines 17-29 *;
 [A]WO2004015349  (LIOS TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *;
 [AD]US2004184700  (LI XIAOCHUN [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]US5996219  (GOLNAS ANASTASIOS M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *
by applicantUS6944360
 US2005061058
 DD240947
 US2004184700
 US5996219
 WO2004015349