Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2440646

EP2440646 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A CLEANING COMPOSITION EMPLOYING DIRECT INCORPORATION OF CONCENTRATED SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WISE, Geoffrey, Marc
205 Rainbow Ridge
Reading Ohio 45215 / US
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Simpson, Tobias Rutger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2014/24]Boubel, Thomas
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/14]Boubel, Thomas
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2012/16]Marollé, Patrick Pierre Pascal
Wella Services GmbH Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date10727263.508.06.2010
WO2010US37704
Priority number, dateUS20090184953P08.06.2009         Original published format: US 184953 P
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010144397
Date:16.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2440646
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010
[2012/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2440646
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:C11D11/00
[2012/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES REINIGUNGSMITTELS DURCH DIREKTEINBAU KONZENTRIERTER TENSIDE[2012/16]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING A CLEANING COMPOSITION EMPLOYING DIRECT INCORPORATION OF CONCENTRATED SURFACTANTS[2012/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE RECOURANT À L'INCORPORATION DIRECTE D'AGENTS TENSIOACTIFS CONCENTRÉS[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2011National basic fee paid 
22.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
13.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2013Fee for grant paid
09.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.12.2013  05.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  04.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte, et al
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
 03  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kameke, Allard von
Handelmannweg 13
22605 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg, et al
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 [2019/50]
Former [2019/46]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2013  05.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  04.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
LKGlobal UK Ltd., et al
Cambridge House, Henry Street
Bath BA1 1BT / GB
 03  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kameke, Allard von
Handelmannweg 13
22605 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg, et al
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2013  05.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  04.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kameke, Allard von
Handelmannweg 13
22605 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Uexküll & Stolberg, et al
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/03]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2013  05.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  04.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kameke, Allard von
Handelmannweg 13
22605 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Muth, Heinz-Peter, et al
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/02]
Opponent(s)01  02.12.2013  05.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  04.12.2013   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Ludwig, Brigitte, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
04.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.05.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1715/16
04.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2010
AL06.03.2013
AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
LU08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
SE09.06.2018
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]HU08.06.2010
AL06.03.2013
AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
LU08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/34]HU08.06.2010
AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
LU08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MK06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/30]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
SM06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
MT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IE08.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/08]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
PL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
IS06.07.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/47]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/44]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/41]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
HR06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
LV06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT06.03.2013
LT06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
NO06.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT06.03.2013
NO06.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2416261  (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]) [A] 1-11 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2006094621  (JORDAN GLENN T IV [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - *;
 [AD]US2008139434  (BASAPPA GEETHA [NL], et al) [AD] 1-11 * example -; claim - *
by applicantUS5635466
 US5958868
 JP2002038200
 US2008139434
 US2003154883
 US3962418
 US3958581
 US2007207109
 US2008206185
 US2004010106
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 EP1696023
 US5741948
 US5994595
 US6346509
 US6417408
 USRE34584E
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US6492326
OppositionWO9620270
 US2008139434
 WO0001474
    - K. SCHRADER, Grundlagen und Rezepturen der Kosmetika, Heidelberg, (19890000), pages 916 - 918, XP055254884