Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2433245

EP2433245 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CREATOR OF A WORK OF ART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scholzen, Werner
Feldstrasse 22
40721 Hilden / DE
[2012/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/13]
Representative(s)Angerhausen, Christoph
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Angerhausen, Christoph
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstraße 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/04]Graf von Schwerin, Wolf
Wildanger Kehrwald Graf v. Schwerin
& Partner Rechtsanwälte
Couvenstrasse 8
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/50]Graf von Schwerin, Wolf
Krieger, Gentz, Mes & Graf von der Groeben Postfach 30 08 43
40408 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/13]Thon, Sabine
Rechtsanwältin
Sabine Thon
Postfach 101256
41012 Mönchengladbach / DE
Application number, filing date10728585.017.05.2010
WO2010DE00534
Priority number, dateDE2009102214720.05.2009         Original published format: DE102009022147
DE2009102375604.06.2009         Original published format: DE102009023756
DE2009104175704.06.2009         Original published format: DE102009041757
[2012/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010133204
Date:25.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2433245
Date:28.03.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010
[2012/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2012/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/13]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG DES URHEBERS EINES KUNSTWERKES[2012/13]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CREATOR OF A WORK OF ART[2012/13]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER L'AUTEUR D'UNE OEUVRE D'ART[2012/13]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2011National basic fee paid 
13.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/13]
17.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/51]
21.10.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/51]
Appeal following examination10.02.2014Appeal received No.  T1145/14
17.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
21.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201203   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2012
31.05.201304   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6017218  (BRIGHT THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 35 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14;
 [XI]  - JOHNSON C R ET AL, "Image processing for artist identification", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/MSP.2008.923513, (20080701), vol. 25, no. 4, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 37 - 48, XP011228189 [X] 1,6,7 * page 37, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 38, paragraph 2 - paragraph 7 * * page 40, paragraph 2 - page 41, paragraph last * * page 42, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2008.923513
 [XI]  - BEREZHNOY I E ET AL, "Authentic: Computerized Brushstroke Analysis", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2005. ICME 2005. AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, 06-08 JULY 2005, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICME.2005.1521739, (20050706), ISBN 978-0-7803-9331-8, pages 1586 - 1588, XP010843976 [X] 1,8,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * Sect.2; page 1 - page 2; figures 2-4 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2005.1521739
 [XI]  - MELZER T ET AL, "Stroke detection of brush strokes in portrait miniatures using a semi-parametric and a model based approach", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFE RENCE ON BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 16-20 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICPR.1998.711184, (19980816), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-8186-8512-5, pages 474 - 476, XP010297588 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1998.711184
 [XI]  - SABLATNIG R ET AL, "Hierarchical classification of paintings using face- and brush stroke models", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFE RENCE ON BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 16-20 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICPR.1998.711107, (19980816), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-8186-8512-5, pages 172 - 174, XP010297463 [X] 1,3 * page 1; figures 2-4 * * sect: face extraction; page 3 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1998.711107
 [XI]  - Lyu, S. and Rockmore, D. and Farid, H., "A digital technique for art authentication", (20041207), Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences 101(49), URL: http://www.pnas.org/content/101/49/17006.abstract, (20100918), XP002601838 [X] 1,6,7 * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 4 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073.pnas.0406398101
 [XI]  - "First International Workshop on Image Processing for Artist Idetification", (20070514), URL: http://www.digitalpaintinganalysis.org/literature/descrip_1_07.pdf, (20100918), XP002601839 [X] 1 * page 1 - page 15 * [I] 2,4,5,10-14
 [A]  - DUDA R ET AL, Pattern Classification, chapter 9: Algorithm-Independent Machine Learning, PATTERN CLASSIFICATION, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, PAGE(S) 453 - 515, (20010101), ISBN 978-0-471-05669-0, XP002472161 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *