Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2433245 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2433245



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 952
06.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.11.2019 Refund of fees Appeal 2
05.11.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.11.2019 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
30.10.2019 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
21.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.10.2019 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.07.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
04.07.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
21.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.05.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.05.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
19.04.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 21
19.04.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
19.04.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
17.04.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
31.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.03.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
04.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
26.02.2014 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
26.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
18.02.2014 Invitation to file an authorisation Appeal 1
12.02.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
10.02.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
31.01.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.01.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.12.2013 Annex Search / examination 6
16.12.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
13.12.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.12.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.12.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.11.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
26.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
26.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
26.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
26.10.2013 Description Search / examination 24
26.10.2013 Description Search / examination 24
26.10.2013 Description Search / examination 24
26.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 24
25.10.2013 Abstract Search / examination 2
25.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 3
25.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
25.10.2013 Description Search / examination 18
25.10.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
25.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 56
25.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 24
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 2
07.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
27.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
27.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
02.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
02.04.2013 Description Search / examination 3
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 10
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
02.04.2013 Non-scannable object Search / examination 5
02.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
28.03.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 17
28.03.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 10
08.01.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
26.09.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.07.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 17
19.07.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 18
19.07.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
19.07.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 40
17.07.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.07.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.07.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
04.07.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.02.2012 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.12.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
16.12.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
16.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
13.12.2011 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
13.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
05.12.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
30.09.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.12.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
17.12.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
17.12.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
25.11.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.11.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.11.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 41
01.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.10.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
20.07.2010 Notification relating to priority claim International Searching Authority 2
15.07.2010 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
02.07.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
02.07.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 3
02.07.2010 Description International Searching Authority 17
02.07.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 20