Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2433245


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Refusal of application published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
30.10.2019 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
30.10.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
19.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2014 Change: Appeal number
23.04.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
08.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
14.03.2014 New entry: Appeal number
28.02.2014 Change - representative published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
12.02.2014 Change: Appeal number
12.02.2014 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.02.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.02.2014 New entry: Appeal number
20.12.2013 Change - representative published on  22.01.2014  [2014/04]
13.12.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
09.12.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2013 Change - representative published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
05.07.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
12.06.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.01.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.09.2012 First examination report
25.09.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.08.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
22.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2012 Change - extension states published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
25.07.2012 Amendment by applicant
29.06.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
24.02.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.03.2012  [2012/13]
24.02.2012 Request for examination filed published on  28.03.2012  [2012/13]
19.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication