Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2449025

EP2449025 - ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2012/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HERMEL-DAVIDOCK, Theresa
21 Brookside Road 26
Randolph NJ 07869 / US
02 / DEMIRORS, Mehmet
2319 Bending Spring Drive
Pearland TX 77584 / US
03 / HAYNE, Sarah
14122 Pinerock Lane
Houston TX 77079 / US
04 / CONG, Rongjuan
144 Indian Warrior
Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/14]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2012/19]Böhm, Brigitte , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date10729769.930.06.2010
[2017/14]
WO2010US40575
Priority number, dateUS20090222371P01.07.2009         Original published format: US 222371 P
[2012/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011002868
Date:06.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2449025
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011
[2012/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2449025
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/08, C08F210/16, C08F210/18, C08F10/00, C08F10/02, C08J5/18
[2016/33]
Former International [2012/19]C08L23/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF ETHYLENBASIS[2012/19]
English:ETHYLENE-BASED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS[2012/19]
French:COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES À BASE D ÉTHYLÈNE[2012/19]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2011National basic fee paid 
20.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/19]
20.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.2017  05.01.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  05.01.2018   
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Industrial Property
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Garcia Martin, Margarita
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Patent Department
Zone Industrielle Feluy C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/07]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2017  05.01.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Lux, Berthold
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  05.01.2018   
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Industrial Property
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Garcia Martin, Margarita
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Patent Department
Zone Industrielle Feluy C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Former [2018/05]
Opponent(s)01  21.12.2017   
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
19.01.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.05.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.04.2019Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.05.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.07.2019Appeal received No.  T2037/19
19.09.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2010
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
MK05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
MT30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU30.06.2010
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
MT30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU30.06.2010
AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
MT30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
MT30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
CH30.06.2017
IE30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
LU30.06.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007136493  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13 * * page 12, line 11 - page 15, line 18 * * page 18, line 20 - page 20, line 25 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]WO2009067337  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0063] , [0083] , [0085] , [0088] , [0090] *;
 [Y]US2004010103  (BOUSSIE THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0106] , [0136] , [0000] , [0138] , [0139] , [0146] , [0152] , [0155] * * page 65, paragraphs 310-316; example 42; table 5 *;
 [A]WO2006081116  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MONRABAL B ET AL, "Crystallization elution fractionation. A new separation process for polyolefin resins", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA 2007 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE, (2007), vol. 257, doi:DOI:10.1002/MASY.200751106, pages 71 - 79, XP002625518 [A] 15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MASY.200751106
 [A]  - SCHOUTERDEN P ET AL, "Fractionation and thermal behaviour of linear low density polyethylene", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 28, no. 12, doi:DOI:10.1016/0032-3861(87)90048-6, ISSN 0032-3861, (19871101), pages 2099 - 2104, (19871101), XP024114079 [A] 15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(87)90048-6
ExaminationWO2007136506
by applicantUS4340563
 US4663220
 US4668566
 US4322027
 US4413110
 US3485706
 US6545088
 US6538070
 US6566446
 US5844045
 US5869575
 US6448341
    - BALKE, THITIRATSAKUL
    - ZINUN, B.H., J. CHEM. PHYS., (1948), vol. 16, page 1099
    - YAU; WALLACE W., "Examples of Using 3D-GPC - TREF for Polyolefin Characterization", MACROMOL. SYMP., (2007), vol. 257, pages 29 - 45
    - B MONRABAL ET AL., MACROMOL. SYMP., (2007), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79
    - KARJALA, TERESA P.; SAMMLER, ROBERT L.; MANGNUS, MARC A.; HAZLITT, LONNIE G.; JOHNSON, MARK S.; HAGEN, CHARLES M., JR.; HUANG, JOE, "Detection of low levels of long-chain branching in polyolefms", ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE - SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, (2008), vol. 66, pages 887 - 891
    - MACROMOLECULES, (2005), vol. 38, page 6988
OppositionWO2007136506
 US5977251
 US6319989
 US2003139546
 WO2007136496
 US3914342
 US2003088037
 WO2009064404
    - "TABLE 2.14", ASUA J.M, Polymer reaction engineering, (20070000), page 106, XP055446763
    - Anonymous, "Polyethylene for film extrusion - European product range", Total Petrochemicals, (20070900), XP055453575
    - "Metallocene Polyethylene for blown and cast films", Total Petrochemicals, (20070900), XP055453585
    - Print out of sales of grade M3410 EP
    - Stephenne V, "Status on new mPE developments for raffia/monofilaments applications (Technical report)", Atofina Research, (20040123), XP055453623